EP4034456 - FOIL ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boards & More GmbH Rabach 1 4591 Molln / AT | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAJANK, Max c/o Boards & More GmbH Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 20789897.4 | 05.10.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020EP77803 | Priority number, date | DE201910126841 | 07.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019126841 | [2022/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069355 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034456 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/24 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
B63B1/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | FOILANORDNUNG | [2022/31] | English: | FOIL ASSEMBLY | [2022/31] | French: | ENSEMBLE AILE PORTANTE | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 29.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6695662 (KELLEY BENJAMIN D [US]) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 64 - column 5, line 34; figures 7-14,21-26 *; | [A]AU2015230676 (FIN CONTROL SYSTEMS PTY LTD) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0180]; figures 1A-16C *; | [YD]DE102018106212 (BOARDS & MORE GMBH [AT]) [YD] 1-12 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | WO2011075808 | US2015017850 | DE102015104199 | DE102015103553 | DE102018106212 | WO2020021138 |