EP3957600 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SULFIDE SOLID ELECTROLYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Takahiro c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1333-2, Haraichi Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 02 /
HYAKUTAKE, Masaru c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1333-2, Haraichi Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 03 /
MIYASHITA, Norihiko c/o Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1333-2, Haraichi Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20790794.0 | 18.03.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020JP12095 | Priority number, date | JP20190079731 | 19.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019079731 | [2022/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020213340 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957600 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3957600 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/14, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/0562, H01B13/00 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
C01B17/22 (EP,KR);
C01B25/14 (EP,KR,US);
H01B13/00 (KR);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/62 (KR);
C01P2006/40 (US);
C01P2006/80 (US);
H01M2300/0068 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SULFID-FESTKÖRPERELEKTROLYTS | [2022/08] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SULFIDE SOLID ELECTROLYTE | [2022/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE AU SULFURE | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2021 | Translation filed | 01.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 28.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013099834 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]); | [XI]EP3171444 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) | International search | [A]JPH02204312 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-4* , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2012176866 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO) [A] 1-4 * , entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | US2016156064 | JP2017199631 |