EP3956105 - TORQUE WRENCH WITH FORCE INDICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiries, Yousef 71 Derech Allenbi 3566424 Haifa / IL | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Icosa Europe Rue d'Oultremont 37 1040 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | ABYOO Centre Monnet Avenue Jean Monnet 1 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | Application number, filing date | 20791188.4 | 07.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020IL50425 | Priority number, date | IL20190266010 | 14.04.2019 Original published format: IL 26601019 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020212977 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956105 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25B23/14, B25B13/28, B25B23/142, B25B23/16 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
B25B23/1425 (EP,IL,US);
B25G1/105 (EP,IL,US);
B25B23/142 (US);
B25B13/462 (IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | DREHMOMENTSCHLÜSSEL MIT KRAFTANZEIGE | [2022/08] | English: | TORQUE WRENCH WITH FORCE INDICATION | [2022/08] | French: | CLÉ DYNAMOMÉTRIQUE À INDICATION DE FORCE | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 02.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE202006017235U (WILLE GMBH & CO KG EDUARD [DE]); | [A]EP2743020 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]); | [X]CN205465938U (HUZHOU CITY SPECIAL EQUIPMENT INSPECTION INST); | [A]DE102015225723 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [X]CN206357133U (TIANJIN XINXUDA TECH CO LTD) | International search | [A]KR200371988Y ; | CN205465938U [XY917] (HUZHOU CITY SPECIAL EQUIPMENT INSPECTION INST); | CN206357133U [XY18] (TIANJIN XINXUDA TECH CO LTD); | [A]US2019084135 (GUO WUN-JIN [TW]); | [PA]CN208913971U (DESTO PNEUMATIC ELEMENT CO LTD) | by applicant | DE202006017235U | US2008074643 | US2010294094 | US2012101515 | WO2012118487 | US2016144492 | TW201701840 | WO2017025406 | WO2017025408 | US2017354403 |