EP3957285 - COVERING FILM, SYSTEM COMPRISING SAME, AND USAGE METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huzhou Innovation Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Room 402, Building 3 No.1336, Hongfeng Road Huzhou, Zhejiang 313001 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states Hozhou Innovation Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. Room 402, Building 3 No.1336, Hongfeng Road Huzhou, Zhejiang 313001 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Jie Room 402, Building 3, No.1366, Hongfeng Road Huzhou, Zhejiang 313001 / CN | 02 /
TANG, Peike Room 402, Building 3, No.1366, Hongfeng Road Huzhou, Zhejiang 313001 / CN | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20791271.8 | 15.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020CN84858 | Priority number, date | CN201910300866 | 15.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910300866 | CN201920508226U | 15.04.2019 Original published format: CN 201920508226 U | [2022/08] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020211763 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957285 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/00, A61F13/02 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A61F13/0206 (EP);
A61K9/7084 (US);
A61F13/00063 (EP);
A61F13/0226 (EP);
A61F13/025 (EP);
A61K31/167 (US);
A61K31/196 (US);
A61K31/445 (US);
A61K8/0208 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | ABDECKFOLIE, SYSTEM DAMIT SOWIE VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN UND ANWENDUNG DAFÜR | [2022/08] | English: | COVERING FILM, SYSTEM COMPRISING SAME, AND USAGE METHOD AND APPLICATION THEREFOR | [2022/08] | French: | FILM DE PROTECTION, SYSTÈME LE COMPRENANT, ET MÉTHODE D'UTILISATION ET APPLICATION S'Y RAPPORTANT | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2021 | Translation filed | 15.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 10.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004086556 (LUO ERIC C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-9,14 * paragraphs [0036] , [0045] , [0067] , [0074] , [0091] - [0094] *; | [X]US2006105029 (ZHANG JIE [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0017] , [0019] , [0034] , [0049] * * figures 1-3; examples 1,3,6 *; | [XI]US2014302118 (KAWAMURA NAOHISA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] , [0037] , [0038] , [0043] , [0048] , [0051] , [0052] * * example 1; table 1 * [I] 4,5; | [X]US2015110852 (ZHANG JIE [US]) [X] 1,14* paragraphs [0007] , [0016] , [0019] - [0024] * | International search | [A]US2006193900 (YASUKOCHI TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* entire document *; | [XY]CN102327161 (AMED CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 5, 6 * description, paragraphs [0038]-[0041] * * description, paragraphs [0038]-[0041] * [Y] [] ; | [A]CN102600013 (SUZHOU BOCHUANG TONGKANG BIOLOG ENGINEERING CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [Y]CN103596560 (ZHANG JIE) [Y] 3, 8-14 * description, paragraphs [0079], [0090] and [0140]-[0142] *; | [A]US2014336557 (DURDAG KEREM [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [A]CN108030592 (WENZHOU PEOPLES HOSPITAL) [A] 1-14 * entire document *; | [Y]CN108420605 (GE JIHONG) [Y] 3-5, 7-14 * description, paragraphs [0067]-[0072] * |