EP3955973 - GENE THERAPIES FOR STARGARDT DISEASE (ABCA4) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts One Beacon Street 31st Floor Boston, MA 02108 / US | [2022/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHANNA, Hemant 159 Dodge Hill Road Sutton, MA 01590 / US | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20791568.7 | 16.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020US28504 | Priority number, date | US201962836493P | 19.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962836493 P | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020214809 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3955973 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N15/861, C12N7/00, C12N15/86 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
A61K48/0058 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61K48/0075 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | GENTHERAPIEN FÜR MORBUS STARGARDT (ABCA4) | [2022/08] | English: | GENE THERAPIES FOR STARGARDT DISEASE (ABCA4) | [2022/08] | French: | THÉRAPIES GÉNIQUES POUR LA MALADIE DE STARGARDT (ABCA4) | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 21.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007042462 (HILDINGER MARKUS [US]) [X] 1-15* example -; claim - *; | [X]US2015259395 (CHALBERG THOMAS W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2018109011 (STICHTING KATHOLIEKE UNIV [NL]) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - * | International search | [A]US2007042462 (HILDINGER MARKUS [US]) [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 * ; Abstract; Paragraphs [0102]-[0106], [0124]; SEQ ID NO: 1 *; | [A]WO2009134418 (FOX CHASE CANCER CT [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 * ; Abstract; Example 3; Pages 58, 90, Table 1; Page 12, Third Paragraph; SEQ ID NO: 792 *; | [A] - SANGERMANO, R et al., "ABCA4 Midigenes Reveal the Full Splice Spectrum of All Reported Noncanonical Splice Site Variants in Stargardt Diseas e", Genome Research, vol. 28, doi:10.1101/gr.226621.117, (20180000), pages 100 - 110, URL: www.genome.org, XP055538937 [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 * ; Abstract; Page 107, Right Column, Fourth Paragraph; Page 108, Right Column, Second Paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.226621.117 | [A] - BAUWENS, M et al., "ABCA4-Associated Disease As A Model for Missing Heritability in Autosomal Recessive Disorders: Novel Noncoding Splice, Cis-regulatory, Structural, and Recurrent Hypomorphic Variants", Genetics in Medicine, (20190123), vol. 21, no. 8, doi:10.1038/s41436-018-0420-y, page 1761, XP036851953 [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 * , Abstract; Page 1762, Right Column, Fourth Paragraph to Page 1762, Left Column, First Paragraph; Page 1763, Left Column, Fourth Paragraph to Fifth Paragraph. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41436-018-0420-y | [A] - SCHULZ, HL et al., "Mutation Spectrum of the ABCA4 Gene in 335 Stargardt Disease Patients From A Multicenter German Cohort - Impact of Selected Deep Intronic Variants and Common SNPs", Invest Ophthalmol Vis Sci, (20170100), vol. 58, doi:10.11671 iovs.16-19936, ISSN 1552-5783, pages 394 - 403, XP055487125 [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 * ; Page 394, Abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/iovs.16-19936 | [A] - SANGERMANO, R et al., "ABCA4 Midigenes Reveal the Full Splice Spectrum of All Reported Noncanonical Splice Site Variants in Stargardt Disease", Genome Research, vol. 28, doi:10.1101/gr.226621.117, (20180000), pages 100 - 110, URL: www.genome.org, XP055538937 [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 * ; Abstract; Page 107, Right Column, Fourth Paragraph; Page 108, RightColumn, Second Paragraph. * [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gr.226621.117 | [A] - "Generation and initial analysis of more than 15,000 full-length human and mouse cDNA sequences", PNAS, (20021224), vol. 99, no. 26, doi:10.1073/pnas.242603899, pages 16899 - 16903, XP008125711 [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.242603899 | [A] - "ABCA4 variant protein [Homo sapiens", GenBank, NCBI, (20150919), Database accession no. BAE06122.2, XP055761000 [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 [A] 1-3, 4/1-3, 5/4/1-3, 7-9, 10/7-9, 11/10/7-9 |