EP3956440 - A NEW TYPE OF ENZYME COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belief Biomed Limited Unit 3A, 12/F, Kaiser Centre No. 18 Centre Street Sai Ying Pun Hong Kong / HK | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states Belief Biomed Limited Unit 3A, 12/F, Kaiser Centre No. 18 Centre Street Sai Ying Pun Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Cheng Unit 3A 12/F Kaiser Centre No. 18 Centre Street, Sai Ying Pun Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
ZHENG, Jing Unit 3A 12/F Kaiser Centre No. 18 Centre Street, Sai Ying Pun Hong Kong / CN | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20791792.3 | 17.04.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020CN85366 | Priority number, date | CN201910322504 | 19.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910322504 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020211843 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3956440 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/02, C12N9/88, C12N15/53, C12N15/63, C12N15/86, C12N15/861, A61K38/44, A61K48/00, A61P25/16, A61P25/28 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
C12N9/0071 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/44 (KR);
A61K38/51 (KR);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61K48/005 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP,CN,US);
A61P25/28 (EP,CN,KR);
C12N15/52 (KR);
C12N15/86 (CN,KR,US);
C12N9/0059 (CN);
C12N9/88 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Y110/03001 (CN);
C12Y114/16 (KR);
C12Y114/16002 (EP,US);
C12Y401/01028 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2207/20 (EP);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/0318 (EP);
A61K38/00 (CN,US);
C07K2319/20 (KR);
C07K2319/41 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | C12N9/02, C12N15/53, C12N15/63, C12N15/86, C12N15/861, A61K38/44, A61K48/00, A61P25/16, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE ENZYMZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/08] | English: | A NEW TYPE OF ENZYME COMPOSITION | [2022/08] | French: | NOUVEAU TYPE DE COMPOSITION ENZYMATIQUE | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 10.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - DAUBNER S. COLETTE ET AL, "Deletion mutants of tyrosine hydroxylase identify a region critical for heparin binding", PROTEIN SCIENCE, US, (19950301), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.1002/pro.5560040320, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 538 - 541, XP093004589 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 538, column r, paragraph 4 - page 540, column r, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 * [A] 7-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pro.5560040320 | [XA] - OTA A ET AL, "Deletion mutagenesis of human tyrosine hydroxylase type 1 regulatory domain.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, Amsterdam NL, (19950824), vol. 213, no. 3, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 1099 - 1106, XP093004585 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * figure 1 * [A] 7-15 | International search | [X]WO9528493 (UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * description, page 12, lines 8-27, page 27, lines 17-22 *; | [X]WO9936513 (AURX INC [US]) [X] 1-29 * Examples 2-4, claims 11-12 *; | [PX]CN109971729 (SHANGHAI XINZHI PHARMACEUTICAL TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-29* claims 1-20 *; | [X] - WALKER S. J. et al., "Catalytic core of rat tyrosine hydroxylase: terminal deletion analysis of bacterially expressed enzyme.", Biochim Biophys Acta, (19940518), vol. 1026, no. 1, pages 113 - 119, XP023788714 [X] 1-4, 14, 17, 19, 24 * the abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-4838(94)90079-5 |