EP3929730 - PATCHING METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REN, Wenjie Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Qiaosheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YIN, Yonghong Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
LI, Yingwei Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
ZHU, Jinpeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
REN, Wenjie Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
HAN, Qiaosheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
YIN, Yonghong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
04 /
LI, Yingwei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
05 /
ZHU, Jinpeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20791977.0 | 13.04.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020CN84364 | Priority number, date | CN201910321094 | 17.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910321094 | [2021/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020211712 | Date: | 22.10.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929730 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/658, G06F8/61 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
G06F8/658 (EP,CN);
G06F8/63 (EP,US);
G06F16/182 (US);
G06F16/188 (US);
G06F8/65 (US);
G06F8/66 (US);
G06F11/1464 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/52] | G06F8/658 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | PATCHING-VERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM | [2021/52] | English: | PATCHING METHOD AND RELATED DEVICE, AND SYSTEM | [2021/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CORRECTION, ET DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉS | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2021 | Translation filed | 23.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 18.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009172338 (EKER JOHAN [SE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0123] * * figures 1,5 *; | [I]US7711706 (MANAPETTY PREMJITH [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 41 * * column 5, line 6 - line 64 * * column 13, line 37 - column 16, line 11 * * column 16, line 49 - column 17, line 10 * * column 26, line 25 - column 27, line 65 *; | [I]US8312447 (CALLAGHAN DAVID M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 1, line 6 - line 27 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 53 - column 6, line 45 *; | [A] - Anonymous, "inode - Wikipedia", (20190404), pages 1 - 5, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Inode&oldid=890873894, (20220315), XP055901428 [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 2, section "Details", paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 2 * | [A] - Anonymous, "File system - Wikipedia", (20190408), pages 1 - 24, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=File_system&oldid=891541222, (20220315), XP055901417 [A] 1-15 * page 3, section "Space management", paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 4, second figure * | International search | [A]US2012054743 (FUJIWARA YUJI [JP])[A] 1-20; | [A]CN102831001 (BEIJING BENY WAVE SCI & TECH) [A] 1-20; | [A]CN103123588 (DONGGUAN YULONG COMM TECH CO, et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]CN105205118 (HANDAN POLYTECHNIC COLLEGE) [A] 1-20; | [A]CN108228224 (HANGZHOU C SKY MICROSYSTEMS CO LTD) [A] 1-20; | [A]CN108279922 (SHENZHEN TBIT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-20; | [PX]CN110109695 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 |