EP4226275 - ACCESS CONTROL WITH FACE RECOGNITION AND HETEROGENEOUS INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASSA ABLOY AB P.O. Box 70340 107 23 Stockholm / SE | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Jianbo Cedar Park, Texas, 78613 / US | 02 /
SACHDEVA, Kapil Round Rock, Texas, 78681 / US | 03 /
PREVOST, Sylvain, Jacques Austin, Texas, 78717 / US | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 20792351.7 | 12.10.2020 | [2023/33] | WO2020EP78642 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022078572 | Date: | 21.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4226275 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62, G06K9/00 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
G06V40/172 (EP,US);
G06F18/253 (EP);
G06V10/809 (US);
G06V20/52 (EP);
G07C9/00563 (US);
G07C9/37 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | ZUGANGSKONTROLLE MIT GESICHTSERKENNUNG UND HETEROGENEN INFORMATIONEN | [2023/33] | English: | ACCESS CONTROL WITH FACE RECOGNITION AND HETEROGENEOUS INFORMATION | [2023/33] | French: | CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS AVEC RECONNAISSANCE FACIALE ET INFORMATIONS HÉTÉROGÈNES | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 13.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 12.05.2023 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.06.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN111611849 (UNIV GUANGDONG TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 15] , [0 16] , [0 17] , [0 21] , [0 62] , [0 59] , [0 60] , [0 89] , [0 78] *; | [Y] - Li Wei ET AL, "Learning and Fusing Multimodal Features from and for Multi-task Facial Computing", (20161014), URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1610.04322.pdf, (20210608), XP055811744 [Y] 1-20 * Section 5; page 6, paragraphs 1, 2 * | [A] - HSIN-CHUN TSAI ET AL, "Long distance person identification using height measurement and face recognition", TENCON 2009 - 2009 IEEE REGION 10 CONFERENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090123), ISBN 978-1-4244-4546-2, pages 1 - 4, XP031617530 [A] 9 * Section B.; page 3 * | [A] - BUSCH C ET AL, "Towards a more secure border control with 3D face recognition", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 5TH NORSK INFORMASJONS SIKKERHETS KONFERANSE (NISK), (20121119), pages 49 - 60, URL: https://www.christoph-busch.de/files/Busch-3DFace-nisk-121012.pdf, XP055812087 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - MULLA MOHAMMADJAVED R ET AL, "Facial image based security system using PCA", 2015 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION PROCESSING (ICIP), IEEE, (20151216), doi:10.1109/INFOP.2015.7489445, pages 548 - 553, XP032911357 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFOP.2015.7489445 |