EP4046091 - SUSTAINABILITY RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'OREAL 14 rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2023/15] |
Former [2022/34] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHARRAUD, Grégoire 9, rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | 02 /
FARCET, Céline 1, avenue Eugène Schueller 93601 Aulnay-Sous-Bois / FR | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Casalonga Casalonga & Partners Bayerstraße 71/73 80335 München / DE | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20792352.5 | 12.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020EP78656 | Priority number, date | US201916601170 | 14.10.2019 Original published format: US201916601170 | US201916601080 | 14.10.2019 Original published format: US201916601080 | [2022/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021074089 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4046091 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q10/06, G06Q50/10 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP);
G06Q10/06 (EP,KR);
G06Q10/04 (CN);
A45D19/08 (KR);
G06Q10/063 (CN);
G06Q30/0207 (CN);
G06Q50/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON NACHHALTIGKEITSRESSOURCEN | [2022/34] | English: | SUSTAINABILITY RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2022/34] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE RESSOURCES DE DURABILITÉ | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 14.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]JP2005293130 (TSUBASA SYSTEM CO LTD, et al) [I] 1-33 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0050] ** paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0065] *; | [I]US2011320054 (BRZEZOWSKI EDWARD H [US]) [I] 1-33 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0054] * |