EP3923585 - VIDEO TRANSCODING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wangsu Science & Technology Co., Ltd. Building A Floor 5 GuangQi Culture Plaza No. 2899 Jia, Xietu Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200030 / CN | [2021/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Anjie Shanghai 200030 / CN | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Murgitroyd & Company Milton Keynes Studio H1B 297 Upper Fourth Street Witan Studios Milton Keynes MK9 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/50] | Raynor, Simon Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20792515.7 | 19.06.2020 | [2021/50] | WO2020CN97172 | Priority number, date | CN202010365039 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: CN202010365039 | [2021/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021217829 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3923585 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2343, H04N21/234, G06T7/10, G06N3/08 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
H04N21/2343 (EP);
H04N19/40 (CN);
H04N19/167 (CN);
H04N19/70 (CN);
H04N21/23418 (EP);
H04N21/234345 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRANSCODIERUNG VON VIDEO | [2021/50] | English: | VIDEO TRANSCODING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRANSCODAGE DE VIDÉO | [2021/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2020 | Translation filed | 27.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/50] | 20.04.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2019073553 (YAO ANBANG [CN], et al) [Y] 9 * figures 1, 2, 6-8 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0066] *; | [Y]US2019357615 (KOH CHONG JIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,9-12,14,15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0107] ** paragraph [0119] *; | [YA] - BERTINI M ET AL, "An Integrated Framework for Semantic Annotation and Adaptation", MULTIMEDIA TOOLS AND APPLICATIONS, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, BO, (20050801), vol. 26, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S11042-005-0893-Y, ISSN 1573-7721, pages 345 - 363, XP019213875 [Y] 1-5,8-12,14,15 * figure 1 * * page 348 - page 349 * * page 351 - page 359 * [A] 6,7,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11042-005-0893-y | [YA] - CAI CHUNLEI ET AL, "End-to-End Optimized ROI Image Compression", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEE SERVICE CENTER , PISCATAWAY , NJ, US, vol. 29, doi:10.1109/TIP.2019.2960869, ISSN 1057-7149, (20191225), pages 3442 - 3457, (20200129), XP011769267 [Y] 1-5,8-12,14,15 * page 3443 - page 3448 * * table I * [A] 6,7,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2019.2960869 | [Y] - PENG JUNRAN ET AL, "POD: Practical Object Detection With Scale-Sensitive Network", 2019 IEEE/CVF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION (ICCV), IEEE, (20191027), doi:10.1109/ICCV.2019.00970, pages 9606 - 9615, XP033723632 [Y] 10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCV.2019.00970 | [Y] - CAVALLARO A ET AL, "Semantic segmentation and description for video transcoding", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2003 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO: 6 - 9 JULY 2003, BALTIMORE MARRIOTT WATERFRONT HOTEL, BALTIMORE, MARYLAND, USA, IEEE OPERATIONS CENTER, US, (20030706), vol. 3, doi:10.1109/ICME.2003.1221382, ISBN 978-0-7803-7965-7, page 597, XP032963473 [Y] 1-5,9-12,14,15 * abstract * * page 597 - page 599 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2003.1221382 | International search | [A]US2014177706 (FERNANDES FELIX C [US], et al)[A] 1-15; | [Y]CN105306960 (UNIV BEIHANG) [Y] 1-15 * 0008, 0013-0014, 0059-0068, 1-2 *; | [Y]CN106791856 (TIANJIN TIANDY PRODUCTIVITY PROMOTION CO LTD) [Y] 6-7, 13 * 0006-0036 *; | [Y] - Li Shi-Jing; Qing Lin-Bo; He Xiao-Hai; Han Jie, "Road Scene Segmentation Based on NVIDIA Jetson TX2", Computer Systems & Applications, (20190115), vol. 28, no. 1, doi:10.15888/j.cnki.csa.006730, ISSN 1003-3254, pages 239 - 244, XP055794567 [Y] 1-15 * , 2-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/: 10.15888/j.cnki.csa.006730 | [Y] - Anonymous, "Development of Model Compression and Inference Acceleration Algorithms of Image Super Resolution Deep Neural Networks", China Master’s Theses Full-text Database, (20200315), pages 1 - 101, XP055794585 [Y] 1-15 |