EP4051580 - LEADING EDGE SLAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COMMIS, Ben c/o Airbus Operations Ltd., UK IP Dept., Pegasus House, Aerospace Avenue, Filton Bristol, BS34 7PA / GB | 02 /
LYONS, Neil c/o Airbus Operations Ltd., UK IP Dept., Pegasus House, Aerospace Avenue, Filton Bristol, BS34 7PA / GB | 03 /
KAY, Edmund c/o Airbus Operations Ltd., UK IP Dept., Pegasus House, Aerospace Avenue, Filton Bristol, BS34 7PA / GB | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20793389.6 | 26.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020EP79998 | Priority number, date | GB20190015796 | 31.10.2019 Original published format: GB 201915796 | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021083821 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051580 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B64C9/24, B64C21/02 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
B64C9/24 (EP,CN);
B64C9/22 (GB);
B64C21/02 (EP,CN,GB,US);
Y02T50/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | EINTRITTSKANTEN-VORFLÜGEL | [2022/36] | English: | LEADING EDGE SLAT | [2022/36] | French: | BEC DE BORD D'ATTAQUE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 28.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0728101 (BOEING CO [US]); | [X]US6135395 (COLLETT EDWARD [GB]); | [A]EP2242685 (BOMBARDIER INC [CA], et al); | [X]WO2011099276 (MITSUBISHI AIRCRAFT CORP [JP], et al); | [X]EP3428059 (BOEING CO [US]) | by applicant | US8899528 |