EP4041399 - HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR USE IN THE TREATMENT OR AMELIORATION OF CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tolremo Therapeutics AG Hofackerstrasse 40B 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLÜCKIGER-MANGUAL, Stefanie c/o TOLREMO therapeutics AG Hofackerstrasse 40B 4132 Muttenz / CH | 02 /
GRUBER, Dorothea c/o TOLREMO therapeutics AG Hofackerstrasse 40B 4132 Muttenz / CH | 03 /
FOLMER, Rutger Heilige Stoel 6802 6601 SW Wijchen / NL | 04 /
HEKKING, Koen F. W. Leeuwstraat 58 6531 RD Nijmegen / NL | 05 /
VEERMAN, Johan J. N. Hendrick Averkamplaan 28 1132 SZ Volendam / NL | 06 /
EERLAND, Martijn Oassisstraat 71 6663 JD Lent / NL | 07 /
FABRITIUS, Charles-Henry c/o TOLREMO therapeutics AG Hofackerstrasse 40B 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/33] | Dörner, Eva Charlotte Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20793571.9 | 01.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP77595 | Priority number, date | EP20190201065 | 02.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19201065 | WO2019EP85557 | 17.12.2019 Original published format: PCT/EP2019/085557 | EP20200182230 | 25.06.2020 Original published format: EP 20182230 | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021064142 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041399 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, C07D401/04, C07D401/14, C07D405/14, C07D407/14, C07D409/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, C07D471/02, C07D495/02, A61K31/506 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR,US);
A61K31/517 (US);
A61K31/53 (US);
A61K31/5377 (US);
A61K31/5386 (US);
A61K31/69 (US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (CN);
C07D405/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D407/14 (EP,IL);
C07D409/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,IL);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07D491/08 (CN);
C07D498/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07F5/027 (US);
C07B2200/05 (US);
C07B2200/07 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | 02.05.2022 | ME | 02.05.2022 | Title | German: | HETEROCYCLISCHE DERIVATE, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER LINDERUNG VON KREBS | [2022/33] | English: | HETEROCYCLIC DERIVATIVES, PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR USE IN THE TREATMENT OR AMELIORATION OF CANCER | [2022/33] | French: | DÉRIVÉS HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES, COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT OU LA RÉGRESSION DU CANCER | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 02.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2018203256 (FONDAZIONE ST ITALIANO TECNOLOGIA [IT], et al) | by applicant | US3773919 | EP0036676 | EP0052322 | EP0088046 | DE3218121 | EP0102324 | US4485045 | EP0133988 | EP0142641 | EP0143949 | US4544545 | WO9741833 | WO9916419 | WO0185136 | US6570036 | WO03053411 | JP2008118008 |