EP4045350 - SHUTTER DEVICE FOR A FRONT-END AIR INTAKE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING A SHUTTER DISCONNECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [2022/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VACCA, Frédéric C/o Valeo Sytèmes Thermiques 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 78320 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR | 02 /
MARION, Laura C/o Valeo Systemes Thermiques 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verriere 78320 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR | 03 /
ARAB, Karim C/o Valeo Sytèmes Thermiques 8 rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR | [2022/34] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [2022/34] | Application number, filing date | 20793765.7 | 08.10.2020 | [2022/34] | WO2020FR51771 | Priority number, date | FR20190011622 | 17.10.2019 Original published format: FR 1911622 | [2022/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021074506 | Date: | 22.04.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4045350 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/08 | [2022/34] | CPC: |
B60K11/085 (EP,CN,US);
B60Y2410/113 (EP);
Y02T10/88 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/34] | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN FRONT-LUFTEINLASS EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS MIT EINER VERSCHLUSSTRENNVORRICHTUNG | [2022/34] | English: | SHUTTER DEVICE FOR A FRONT-END AIR INTAKE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING A SHUTTER DISCONNECTION DEVICE | [2022/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'OBTURATION POUR ENTREE D'AIR DE FACE AVANT DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF DE DESOLIDARISATION DE VOLET | [2022/34] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/34] | 10.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014094104 (MANHIRE JEFFREY BRUCE [US], et al); | [Y]WO2014205217 (MAGNA INT INC [CA], et al); | [A]FR3020021 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]); | [A]FR3052111 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]); | [A]WO2018078261 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]); | [XAYI]US2018170171 (SOLAZZO DOMENICO [DE], et al) |