EP4049207 - METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR TRACKING AN ITEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SELVAKANI, Kanna Floor No. 10, Building No. 12C, Raheja Mindspace Cyberabad, Hitech City, Madhapur Hyderabad, Telangana 500081 / IN | 02 /
MANDA, Suresh Floor No. 10, Building No. 12C, Raheja Mindspace Cyberabad, Hitech City, Madhapur Hyderabad, Telangana 500081 / IN | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20793803.6 | 29.09.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020IB59078 | Priority number, date | IN201911042678 | 21.10.2019 Original published format: IN201911042678 | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021079212 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4049207 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERFOLGUNG EINES GEGENSTANDES | [2022/35] | English: | METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR TRACKING AN ITEM | [2022/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SUIVI D'UN ARTICLE | [2022/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 16.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2018122118 (DOTTERWEICH ANDREW [US], et al) [I] 1-7,10-17,19,20 * paragraphs [0034] - [0035] - [0 37] , [0 40] - [0041] - [0 51] , [0055] - [0057] - [0 70] - [0074] - [0082] - [0084] *; | [A] - David Munoz ET AL, "Position Location Techniques and Applications", Position Location Techniques and Applications, (20090101), ISBN 978-0-12-374353-4, XP055756505 [A] 1-7,10-17,19,20 * page 11 * |