EP3959996 - EMULSION COMPOSITION USING SEED STORAGE PROTEIN AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mizkan Holdings Co., Ltd. 6 Nakamura-cho 2-chome Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8585 / JP | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKEMURA Tomoya c/o MIZKAN HOLDINGS CO., LTD., 6, Nakamura-cho 2- chome Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8585 / JP | 02 /
NAKABAYASHI Masashi c/o MIZKAN HOLDINGS CO., LTD., 6, Nakamura-cho 2- chome Handa-shi, Aichi 475-8585 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMURA Yasuki c/o Laboratory of Quality Analysis and Assessment Division of Agronomy and Horticultural Science Graduate School of Agriculture, KYOTO UNIVERSITY Gokasho Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0011 / JP | 04 /
MATSUMIYA Kentaro c/o Laboratory of Quality Analysis and Assessment Division of Agronomy and Horticultural Science Graduate School of Agriculture, KYOTO UNIVERSITY Gokasho Uji-shi, Kyoto 611-0011 / JP | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20794130.3 | 23.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020JP17450 | Priority number, date | JP20190086309 | 26.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019086309 | [2022/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020218402 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3959996 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23L27/60, A23D7/00, A23L11/00 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
A23D7/003 (EP,US);
A23L27/60 (EP,US);
A23D7/04 (EP,US);
A23D7/06 (EP,US);
A23L11/05 (EP);
A23L19/01 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | A23L27/60, A23D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | EMULSIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT SAATSPEICHERPROTEIN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2022/09] | English: | EMULSION COMPOSITION USING SEED STORAGE PROTEIN AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2022/09] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ÉMULSION UTILISANT UNE PROTÉINE DE STOCKAGE DE SEMENCES ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2021 | Translation filed | 19.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 03.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 18.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2006082640 (PEACE BEANS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XY]US2013260008 (BIALEK JADWIGA MALGORZATA [NL], et al); | International search | [YA]JPS6131056 (K BIOLOGICAL SCI LAB) [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 8-12, 14-15, 17-19, 21-23 [A] 1, 4, 7, 13, 16, 20; | [YA]JPH07213227 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 8-12, 14-15, 17-19, 21-23 [A] 1, 4, 7, 13, 16, 20; | [YA]JP2007508817 [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 8-12, 14-15, 17-19, 21-23 [A] 1, 4, 7, 13, 16, 20; | [YA]JP2012110244 (NISSHIN OILLIO GROUP LTD) [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 8-12, 14-15, 17-19, 21-23 [A] 1, 4, 7, 13, 16, 20; | [XA] - Yoko Tanisawa, Minako Yabuki, Mai Utsumi, Kentaro Matsumiya, Yasuki Matsumura, Midori Kasai, "Effects of Various Agricultural Food Particles on Emulsifying and Foaming Properties", Journal of cookery science of Japan, JP, (20171130), vol. 51, no. 1, doi:10.11402/cookeryscience.51.26, ISSN 1341-1535, pages 26 - 36, XP009530819 [X] 1-2, 4-5, 7-14, 16-17, 19-23 [A] 3, 6, 15, 18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.11402/cookeryscience.51.26 | [YA] - EVANS, M. et al., "Emulsion stabilisation using polysaccharide-protein complexes", Current Opinion in Colloid & Interface Science, (20130800), vol. 18, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.cocis.2013.04.004, ISSN 1359-0294, pages 272 - 282, XP055758859 [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 8-12, 14-15, 17-19, 21-23 [A] 1, 4, 7, 13, 16, 20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cocis.2013.04.004 | [YA] - Xu Duoxia; Zhang Jinjing; Cao Yanping; Wang Jing; Xiao Junsong, "Influence of microcrystalline cellulose on the microrheological property and freeze-thaw stability of soybean protein hydrolysate stabilized curcumin emulsion", LWT- Food Science and Technology, (20151106), vol. 66, doi:10.1016/j.lwt.2015.11.002, ISSN 0023-6438, pages 590 - 597, XP029344630 [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 8-12, 14-15, 17-19, 21-23 [A] 1, 4, 7, 13, 16, 20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lwt.2015.11.002 | [YA] - Yan-Teng Xu, Liu Ling-Ling, "Structural and Functional Properties of Soy Protein Isolates Modified by Soy Soluble Polysaccharides", Journal of Agricultural and Food Chemistry, (20160908), vol. 64, no. 38, doi:10.1021/acs.jafc.6b02737, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 7275 - 7284, XP055758870 [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 8-12, 14-15, 17-19, 21-23 [A] 1, 4, 7, 13, 16, 20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jafc.6b02737 | [YA] - Akihiro Nakamura, Maeda Hirokazu, Corredig Milena, "Influence of Heating on Oil-in-Water Emulsions Prepared with Soybean Soluble Polysaccharide", Journal of Agricultural and Food Chemistry, (20061222), vol. 55, no. 2, doi:10.1021/jf062634g, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 502 - 509, XP055758873 [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 8-12, 14-15, 17-19, 21-23 [A] 1, 4, 7, 13, 16, 20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf062634g | [YA] - Liu Fu; Tang Chuan-He, "Soy glycinin as food-grade Pickering stabilizers: Part. I. Structural characteristics, emulsifying properties and adsorption/arrangement at interface", Food Hydrocolloids, (20150502), vol. 60, doi:10.1016/j.foodhyd.2015.04.025, ISSN 0268-005X, pages 606 - 619, XP029564967 [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 8-12, 14-15, 17-19, 21-23 [A] 1, 4, 7, 13, 16, 20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodhyd.2015.04.025 | [YA] - Fumio YAMAUCHI, Yasushi OGAWA, Yoshiro KAMATA, Kazuo SHIBASAKI, "Emulsifying Properties of Soybean beta -Conglycinin and Glycinin: Evaluation by Turbidimetry", Agricultural and Biological Chemistry, (19820000), vol. 46, no. 3, doi:10.1271/bbb1961.46.615, ISSN 0002-1369, pages 615 - 621, XP055758876 [Y] 2-3, 5-6, 8-12, 14-15, 17-19, 21-23 [A] 1, 4, 7, 13, 16, 20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1271/bbb1961.46.615 | by applicant | WO2004043167 | JP2005270099 | WO2006129647 | WO2008069273 | JP2010193909 | - KEISUKE KITAMURA et al., All about Soybeans, Science Forum Inc., (20100000), pages 114 - 127 | - SATOSHI FUJITA, Emulsification of Foods-Basics and Applications, Saiwai Shobo Co., Ltd., (20060000), pages 291 - 293 | - "Science of Soybeans", FUMIO YAMAUCHIKAZUYOSHI OKUBO, Science of Food, Asakura Publishing Co., Ltd., (19920000), pages 143 - 146 | - "Standard Tables of Food Composition in Japan 2015 (Seventh Revised Version) Supplementary", Tables of Food Composition, Ministry of Health, Labor and Welfare, (20180000), page 236 |