EP3960813 - HEAT-RESISTANT POLYOLEFIN-BASED MICROPOROUS FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K- E- E LLC 24-18, Highland-2 Yokosuka City, Kanagawa 239-0833 / JP | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURIBAYASHI, Isao 24-18, Highland-2 Yokosuka City, Kanagawa 2390833 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Kazuishi Sanuki City, Kagawa 7692101 / JP | 03 /
NISHIMURA, Masao Sanuki City, Kagawa 7692101 / JP | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 20794148.5 | 24.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020JP17846 | Priority number, date | JP20190095546 | 26.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019095546 | JP20200076913 | 23.04.2020 Original published format: JP 2020076913 | [2022/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020218583 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3960813 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/403, C08L23/18, C08J9/00, C08J9/28, C08L23/06, C08L23/20, H01G11/52, H01M10/058, H01M10/0525, C08J5/18, H01M50/417, H01M50/426, H01M50/489, H01M50/491, H01M50/494 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08L23/20 (EP,US);
H01G11/52 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M50/403 (EP);
H01M50/417 (EP,US);
H01M50/426 (EP,US);
H01M50/489 (EP,US);
H01M50/491 (EP,US);
H01M50/494 (EP,US);
C08J2323/18 (EP,US);
C08J2423/06 (EP);
C08J2423/14 (EP);
C08L2205/035 (EP,US);
C08L2207/068 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/20, C08L23/04, C08L23/04, C08L23/04, C08L23/04, C08L23/04, C08L23/04, C08L23/14, C08L53/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | C08L23/18, C08J9/00, C08J9/28, C08L23/06, C08L23/20, H01G11/52, H01M2/16, H01M10/058 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | HITZEBESTÄNDIGER MIKROPORÖSER FILM AUF POLYOLEFINBASIS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2022/09] | English: | HEAT-RESISTANT POLYOLEFIN-BASED MICROPOROUS FILM AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2022/09] | French: | FILM MICROPOREUX À BASE DE POLYOLÉFINE RÉSISTANT À LA CHALEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | Translation filed | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 17.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]JP2018076474 (KEE KK); | [IA]JP2018076475 (KEE KK) | International search | [A]WO2007037289 (TONEN SEKIYUKAGAKU KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-19; | [A]WO2007049568 (TONEN SEKIYUKAGAKU KK [JP], et al)[A] 1-19; | [A]JP2009301921 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD, et al) [A] 1-19; | [Y]WO2016031466 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 18-19 * claims, paragraphs [0107], [0108], [0138], examples *; | [XYA]JP2017088836 (KEE:KK) [X] 1-12, 19 * claims, paragraphs [0017], [0021], examples * [Y] 18-19 [A] 13-17; | [XYA]JP2018076476 (KEE KK) [X] 1-12, 19 * claims, paragraphs [0017], [0021], examples * [Y] 18-19 [A] 13-17 | by applicant | JPH08250097 | JPH1017693 | JP2011184671 | JP2012530619 | JP2012530618 | JP5766291B | JP2017088836 | JP2018076476 | - ISAO KURIBAYASHINIKKAN KOGYO SHIMBUN, Lithium-Ion Secondary Battery, (19960000), pages 107 - 120 |