EP3940103 - THICK STEEL PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kobe Seiko Sho (Kobe Steel, Ltd.) 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | [2022/28] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOBE SEIKO SHO (KOBE STEEL, LTD.) 2-4, Wakinohama-Kaigandori 2-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-8585 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKO, Hidenori c/o Kobe Corporate Research Laboratories in Kobe Steel, Ltd. 5-5, Takatsukadai 1-chome Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | [2022/28] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
NAKO, Hidenori Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2271 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20794425.7 | 30.03.2020 | [2022/03] | WO2020JP14612 | Priority number, date | JP20190081271 | 22.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019081271 | JP20200007626 | 21.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020007626 | [2022/03] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020217873 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3940103 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/38, C22C38/18, C22C38/12, C22C38/16, C22C38/08, C21D8/02, C21D1/02, C21D9/46, C22C38/14, C22C38/04, C22C38/58 | [2022/48] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,KR);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR);
C21D1/02 (EP);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR);
C21D8/0231 (EP);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR);
C22C38/001 (KR);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/005 (EP);
C22C38/06 (KR);
C22C38/08 (EP,KR);
C22C38/12 (EP,KR);
C22C38/14 (EP,KR);
C22C38/16 (EP,KR);
C22C38/18 (EP);
C22C38/38 (EP,KR);
C21D2201/05 (EP);
C21D2211/005 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/03] | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C22C38/14, C22C38/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] | Title | German: | DICKE STAHLPLATTE | [2022/03] | English: | THICK STEEL PLATE | [2022/03] | French: | PLAQUE D'ACIER ÉPAISSE | [2022/03] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2021 | Translation filed | 14.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 31.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP5679091B ; | [I]JP5812193B ; | [A]JP2016148105 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP) | International search | [Y]WO2011096456 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2011179042 (JFE STEEL CORP); | [XYA]JP2013204145 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [YA]JP2019502018 ; | [YA]WO2019058424 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JPH08158006 | JP2007270194 | JP2008025014 | JP2009127065 | JP2019081271 | JP2020007626 |