EP3960926 - SYNTHETIC LEATHER AND COATED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 12.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-muromachi, 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8666 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, Masaru c/o Seta Plant, Toray Industries, Inc., 1-1, Oe 1-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-2141 / JP | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20794451.3 | 17.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020JP16835 | Priority number, date | JP20190083666 | 25.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019083666 | [2022/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020218178 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3960926 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D06N3/00, B32B27/12, D04H1/42, D06M15/564, B32B5/02, D04H1/4242, D04H1/4342, D04H1/488, D04H1/498, D04H1/551, D06N3/14, D04H1/485, B60N2/58, D04H1/4382 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
D04H1/4242 (EP);
D06N3/0013 (US);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/024 (EP);
B32B5/028 (EP);
B60N2/5891 (EP);
D04H1/4342 (EP);
D04H1/4382 (EP);
D04H1/485 (EP);
D04H1/488 (EP);
D04H1/498 (EP);
D04H1/551 (EP);
D06N3/0006 (EP);
D06N3/0011 (EP,US);
D06N3/0052 (EP);
D06N3/0059 (EP);
B32B2250/20 (EP);
B32B2255/02 (EP);
B32B2255/26 (EP);
B32B2255/28 (EP);
B32B2260/023 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2262/023 (EP);
B32B2262/0261 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/0276 (EP);
B32B2262/0284 (EP);
B32B2262/148 (EP);
B32B2262/152 (EP);
B32B2307/302 (EP);
B32B2307/3065 (EP);
B32B2307/54 (EP);
B32B2307/554 (EP);
B32B2307/5825 (EP);
B32B2307/718 (EP);
B32B2307/748 (EP);
B32B2605/003 (EP);
B32B2605/08 (EP);
B32B2605/12 (EP);
B32B2605/18 (EP);
D06N2201/0272 (EP,US);
D06N2209/067 (EP,US);
D06N2209/10 (EP);
D06N2211/14 (US);
D06N2211/26 (US);
D06N2211/263 (EP);
D06N2211/266 (EP);
D06N2211/267 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | D06N3/00, B32B27/12, D04H1/42, D06M15/564 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | KUNSTLEDER UND BESCHICHTETER ARTIKEL | [2022/09] | English: | SYNTHETIC LEATHER AND COATED ARTICLE | [2022/09] | French: | CUIR SYNTHÉTIQUE ET ARTICLE REVÊTU | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2021 | Translation filed | 13.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 04.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008133578 (TEIJIN CORDLEY LTD) [A] 1-13* examples 1-4 *; | [Y]US2010247843 (YOSHIDA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0017]; examples 1-2 *; | [Y]US2011207379 (HENKES HANS [DE]) [Y] 1-4,6-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007]; examples 2,4,5 *; | [Y]US2015165745 (KWEON DOWAN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-13 * paragraphs [0110] - [0111]; examples 2-1; table 7 *; | [Y]WO2018123290 (KYOWA LEATHER CLOTH [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] - [0009] - [0019]; examples 1-2; table 1 *; | [Y]WO2018177808 (GREINER AEROSPACE GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-5,7-13 * page 1, lines 3-5 * * page 1, line 34 - page 2, line 4 * * page 11, lines 8-12 * * page 12, line 5 - page 13, line 28 * | International search | [A]JPH07227488 (TAKASHIMAYA NIPPATSU KOGYO, et al) [A] 1-13; | [A]US2002182967 (ERB DAVID F [US], et al) [A] 1-13* whole document *; | [A]US2008070465 (WILES THOMAS COBBETT [US]) [A] 1-13 * whole document *; | [A]WO2009081760 (FUJI CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP4870412B [A] 1-13; | [A]JP2014025156 (KURARAY CO) [A] 1-13; | [A]WO2017006807 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-13 | by applicant | JP2010077554 | WO2013187492 |