EP3959151 - SELECTIVELY OPENABLE CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berry Global, Inc. 101 Oakley Street Evansville, Indiana 47710 / US | [2024/14] |
Former [2022/09] | For all designated states Berry Global, Inc. 101 Oakley Street Evansville, Indiana 47710 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRENCH, Jordan, Robert 3700 Aspen Drive Evansville, Indiana 47711 / US | 02 /
TEMPEL, Seth, A. 1418 Brookside Dr. Evansville, Indiana 47714 / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Bryers Intellectual Property Ltd Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent, Emerson's Green Bristol, BS16 7FR / GB | [2024/14] |
Former [2022/09] | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20794703.7 | 22.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020US29307 | Priority number, date | US201962837495P | 23.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962837495 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020219536 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3959151 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3959151 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/08, B65D50/06 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
B65D47/0833 (EP,US);
B65D50/045 (US);
B65D50/061 (EP);
B65D50/062 (EP);
B65D2215/02 (EP,US);
B65D2251/1016 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELEKTIV ZU ÖFFNENDER VERSCHLUSS FÜR EINEN BEHÄLTER | [2022/09] | English: | SELECTIVELY OPENABLE CLOSURE FOR A CONTAINER | [2022/09] | French: | FERMETURE POUVANT ÊTRE OUVERTE DE MANIÈRE SÉLECTIVE POUR UN RÉCIPIENT | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 23.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 03.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9737900 (METAL BOX PLC [GB], et al) [X] 15 * page 3, line 25 - page 13, line 22; figure - *[A] 1-14 | International search | [A]US3623622 (SULLIVAN PETER) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US3773203 (GRIMALDI A, et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [XA]GB2158048 (PURESEVIC PETER J, et al) [X] 1, 4, 15, 19-20 * , entire document * [A] 8-13, 16-18; | [A]US4991729 (HUNTER ROBERT M [US]) [A] 3 * , entire document *; | [A]US5348201 (KOO JAMES Y C [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US5593054 (GLYNN KENNETH P [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2008116163 (SAWYER DUANE [US]) [A] 8-13, 16-18 * , entire document *; | [A]US2010005641 (DRUITT RODNEY [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [XA]US2010147732 (DELAGRANGE DONALD PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 5-7, 14 * , entire document * [A] 3 | by applicant | WO9737900 |