EP3958881 - ABCB5+ STEM CELL THERAPEUTICS FOR LIVER DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Children's Medical Center Corporation 55 Shattuck Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | For all designated states Ticeba GmbH Im Neuenheimer Feld 517 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANK, Markus, H. 9 Brewer Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 02 /
GANSS, Christoph c/o TICEBA GmbH Tissue and Cell Banking Im Neuenheimer Feld 517 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
KLUTH, Mark Andreas c/o TICEBA GmbH Tissue and Cell Banking Im Neuenheimer Feld 517 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/09] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 20795305.0 | 24.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020US29833 | Priority number, date | US201962838062P | 24.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962838062 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020219895 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958881 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/545, C12N5/0797, A61P1/16 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
A61P1/16 (EP,AU,US);
A61K35/28 (EP,AU,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,AU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | ABCB5+-STAMMZELLTHERAPEUTIKA FÜR LEBERERKRANKUNGEN | [2022/09] | English: | ABCB5+ STEM CELL THERAPEUTICS FOR LIVER DISEASE | [2022/09] | French: | AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES À CELLULES SOUCHES ABCB5+ CONTRE UNE MALADIE HÉPATIQUE | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 27.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 11.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]WO2007143139 (BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * pg 8 Ins 8-15; pg 9 Ins 8-31; pg 22 Ins 7-31, pg 10 Ins 24-28, pg 3 Ins 17-20; pg 4 Ins 22-29; pg 15 Ins 16-30; claims 15, 26, 27 and 45 *; | [X]WO2014182994 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 1-11* pg 2 Ins 24-26; pg 4 Ins 17-21; pg 13 Ins 4-14; pg 8 Ins 14-31; pg 9 Ins 1-3, 16-18, 26-31; pg 11 Ins 1-8; pg 32 Ins 29-32; claims 30, 31, 33 and 34; pg 19 In 1-pg 20 In 7; pg 24 Ins 3-32 *; | [X] - TIETZE, L et al., "Assessment of the hepatocytic differentiation ability of human skin- derived ABCB5+ stem cells", Experimental Cell Research, (20180000), vol. 369, doi:10.1016/j.yexcr.2018.05.040, pages 335 - 347, XP085432995 [X] 1-11 * Abstract, paras 2.1, 2.9, end of 3.2, 3.3, 3.4, 4.2 and 4.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yexcr.2018.05.040 |