EP3958712 - DIGITAL SHADOW BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kool Brands, LLC 5605 Riggins Court, Suite 200 Reno, Nevada 89502 / US | [2022/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NGOY, Titi 5190 Neil Road, Suite 430 Reno, Nevada 89502 / US | 02 /
PANG, Roney 5190 Neil Road, Suite 430 Reno, Nevada 89502 / US | [2022/09] | Representative(s) | Bates, Daniel Joseph Ogive Intellectual Property Ltd 34 Westgate North Cave Brough HU15 2NJ / GB | [2022/09] | Application number, filing date | 20795509.7 | 21.04.2020 | [2022/09] | WO2020US29160 | Priority number, date | US201962836708P | 21.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962836708 P | [2022/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020219471 | Date: | 29.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3958712 | Date: | 02.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47G1/06, A47F7/03, A47G1/12, G09F13/04, G09F27/00, G09F1/12, G02B30/52, B44F7/00 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
A47G1/0622 (EP,US);
A47G1/0616 (EP);
A47G1/065 (EP);
A47G1/12 (EP,US);
B44F7/00 (EP);
A47G2200/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | A47G1/06, A47F7/03, A47G1/12, G09F13/04, G09F27/00, G09F1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] | Title | German: | DIGITALE SCHATTENBOX | [2022/09] | English: | DIGITAL SHADOW BOX | [2022/09] | French: | BOÎTE-CADRE NUMÉRIQUE | [2022/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 09.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/50] | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9428529 (DUSHANE STEVEN D [US], et al) [Y] 14* page 2, line 29 *; | [X]KR200318355Y (-) [X] 1,7 * figures 1,3 *; | [XY]KR20030062124 (DREAM ART [KR]) [X] 1,7 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 3,11-14; | [Y]US2004226209 (AYALA BERNARDO [US]) [Y] 3,13 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]KR200369165Y (-) [Y] 3,13 * figure 2 *; | [Y]US2009100732 (SEIDLER STEWART [HK]) [Y] 11,12 * abstract *; | [XY]JP2016212335 (DATE KENZO) [X] 1,6 * figures 1,2,6 * [Y] 3,11-14; | [XY]KR20180001738U (-) [X] 1,2,4-10 * figures 1-4 * [Y] 3,11-14 | International search | [XYA]US3666936 (WEBSTER RANSON W JR, et al) [X] 1-2, 6 * , entire document, especially Figs. 1-2; column 1, line 33-37 * [Y] 6-13, 17-18 [A] 14-16; | [XYA]US3806722 (PEAKE G, et al) [X] 1-2, 6 * , entire document, especially Figs. 1-3; column 2, line 35-39 * [Y] 6-13, 17-18 [A] 14-16; | [Y]US2001041975 (LOUDERMILK ALAN R [US]) [Y] 5 * , entire document, especially para [0033] *; | [Y]US2008204258 (DAYTON DOUGLAS C [US], et al) [Y] 4, 8-10 * , entire document, especially para [0026], [0032] *; | [A]US7984578 (KABEL SONJA [US]) [A] 1-18* , entire document *; | [Y]US2018303252 (DEMIRCIFT JAY CECIL [US], et al) [Y] 17-18 * , entire document, especially para [0029] *; | [Y] - TheAtheistOfficer, "Vocca Pro", YouTube, (20151214), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=wgmklsbyqbc, XP054981162 [Y] 5 * entire document, especially demonstration 0:14-0:36 * |