EP4038653 - QUICK DISCONNECT SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/32] | QUICK-BREAK DISCONNECT SWITCH | ||
[2023/24] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lell, Peter Am Mühlbachbogen 85 85368 Moosburg / DE | [2022/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/32] | Representative(s) | Simandi, Claus Simandi Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 45 10719 Berlin / DE | [2022/32] | Application number, filing date | 20797034.4 | 02.10.2020 | [2022/32] | WO2020EP77628 | Priority number, date | EP20190201212 | 02.10.2019 Original published format: EP 19201212 | [2022/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021064160 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4038653 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4038653 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01H39/00, F42B3/00, // F15B15/10, F15B15/19 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H01H39/006 (EP,US);
H01H39/00 (CN);
F42B3/006 (EP);
F15B15/10 (EP);
F15B15/19 (EP);
H01H2039/008 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/32] | H01H39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLTRENNSCHALTER | [2022/32] | English: | QUICK DISCONNECT SWITCH | [2023/24] | French: | SECTIONNEUR RAPIDE | [2023/24] |
Former [2022/32] | QUICK-BREAK DISCONNECT SWITCH | ||
Former [2022/32] | SECTIONNEUR À COUPURE RAPIDE | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/32] | 02.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE19817133 (LELL PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7-10,12-17 * column 5, lines 10-25; figures 17, 18a, 18b; claims 5, 6, 35, 40 * * column 1, lines 3-9 * * column 3, lines 5-15 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 17; figures 8a - 11e * * column 6, lines 56-62 * [I] 3,5,6,11; | [XI]US2004112239 (PARKS BRENT [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,13-15,17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 41] - [0047]; figures 3A, 3B * * paragraphs [0030] - [0040]; figures 1, 2A, 2B *[I] 6,8-12,16; | [XI]FR2957452 (SNPE MATERIAUX ENERGETIQUES [FR]) [X] 1,2,7-10,12-15 * page 9, lines 17-28; figures 13A, 13B; claims 1-6, 8 * [I] 3-6,11,16; | [XI]AT517907B (HIRTENBERGER AUTOMOTIVE SAFETY GMBH & CO KG [AT]) [X] 1,8-11,13,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figures 1-3; claims 1-3, 7, 8, 10 * [I] 4,6 | Examination | AT517907 | by applicant | EP0563947 | DE4402994 | DE4438157 | DE19616993 |