EP4061610 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE PRESSURIZED-FLUID VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Air Liquide, société anonyme pour l'Étude et l'Exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75 quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPIN, Philippe c/o CAMPUS INNOVATION PARIS-L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. 1 chemin de la Porte des Loges 78350 Les Loges-en-Josas / FR | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 20797138.3 | 02.11.2020 | [2022/39] | WO2020EP80624 | Priority number, date | FR20190012927 | 20.11.2019 Original published format: FR 1912927 | [2022/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021099094 | Date: | 27.05.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4061610 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4061610 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/60, B29C53/84, B29C53/58 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
B29C53/602 (EP,KR);
B29C53/564 (US);
B29C53/581 (EP,KR);
B29C53/582 (KR);
B29C53/60 (EP);
B29C53/845 (EP,KR,US);
B29C63/26 (KR);
B29K2101/12 (US);
B29K2307/04 (US);
B29K2309/08 (US);
B29K2713/005 (US);
B29K2995/0063 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZUSAMMENGESETZTEN DRUCKFLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTERS | [2022/39] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE PRESSURIZED-FLUID VESSEL | [2022/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN RÉSERVOIR COMPOSITE DE FLUIDE SOUS PRESSION | [2022/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 20.06.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 02.08.2023 | |
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 02.08.2023 | |
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR3037633 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR3076594 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1-11* figure 1 * |