EP3871358 - RADIO RESOURCE MAPPING OF A FEEDBACK CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ofinno, LLC 11091 Sunset Hills Road, Suite 510 Reston, VA 20190 / US | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUI, Bing 11091 Sunset Hills Road Suite 510 Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | 02 /
DINAN, Esmael 11091 Sunset Hills Road Suite 510 Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | 03 /
ZHOU, Hua 11091 Sunset Hills Road Suite 510 Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | 04 /
CHAE, Hyukjin 11091 Sunset Hills Road Suite 510 Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | 05 /
YI, Yunjung 11091 Sunset Hills Road Suite 510 Reston, Virginia 20190 / US | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2022/51] |
Former [2021/35] | Westphal, Mussgnug Patentanwälte & Partner mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20797605.1 | 05.10.2020 | [2021/35] | WO2020US54211 | Priority number, date | US201962910195P | 03.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962910195 P | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021067912 | Date: | 08.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3871358 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3871358 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04L1/18 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1861 (EP,CN);
H04W72/20 (US);
H04L1/1812 (KR,US);
H04L1/1864 (KR);
H04L5/0007 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0094 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W4/40 (KR);
H04W72/25 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKRESSOURCENABBILDUNG EINES RÜCKKOPPLUNGSKANALS | [2021/35] | English: | RADIO RESOURCE MAPPING OF A FEEDBACK CHANNEL | [2021/35] | French: | MAPPAGE DE RESSOURCES RADIO D'UN CANAL DE RÉTROACTION | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22213711.9 / EP4170956 | EP24195122.7 | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.12.2022 | AT | 21.12.2022 | CZ | 21.12.2022 | DK | 21.12.2022 | EE | 21.12.2022 | ES | 21.12.2022 | FI | 21.12.2022 | HR | 21.12.2022 | IT | 21.12.2022 | LT | 21.12.2022 | LV | 21.12.2022 | MC | 21.12.2022 | PL | 21.12.2022 | RO | 21.12.2022 | RS | 21.12.2022 | SE | 21.12.2022 | SI | 21.12.2022 | SK | 21.12.2022 | SM | 21.12.2022 | NO | 21.03.2023 | GR | 22.03.2023 | IS | 21.04.2023 | PT | 21.04.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
IT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SI | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
DK | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
IS | 21.04.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
PL | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SK | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.12.2022 | |
AT | 21.12.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 21.12.2022 | |
CZ | 21.12.2022 | ||
EE | 21.12.2022 | ||
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RO | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 21.12.2022 | |
ES | 21.12.2022 | ||
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
PT | 21.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 21.12.2022 | |
FI | 21.12.2022 | ||
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
SM | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
HR | 21.12.2022 | ||
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
RS | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
LV | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
GR | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 21.12.2022 | |
LT | 21.12.2022 | ||
SE | 21.12.2022 | ||
NO | 21.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 21.12.2022 | |
NO | 21.03.2023 | Cited in | Examination | EP3949208 |