EP3965343 - FEEDBACK CONTROL METHOD, UE AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAO, Wei 283, BBK Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2022/10] | Application number, filing date | 20798245.5 | 20.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020CN85712 | Priority number, date | CN201910365493 | 30.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910365493 | [2022/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020221047 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965343 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L1/18 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (CN,KR);
H04L1/1812 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L1/1607 (CN,US);
H04L1/1671 (KR);
H04L1/1822 (EP);
H04L1/1861 (EP);
H04L1/1896 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0094 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKKOPPLUNGSSTEUERUNG, BENUTZERGERÄT UND NETZWERKGERÄT | [2022/10] | English: | FEEDBACK CONTROL METHOD, UE AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE RÉTROACTION, UE ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2021 | Translation filed | 12.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 19.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN108271262 (BEIJING SAMSUNG TELECOM R&D CT, et al); | [A]CN109150436 (SHANGHAI NOKIA BELL CO LTD); |