EP3962333 - AIR EXTRACTION AND PRESSURE RELEASE ASSEMBLY, VACUUM HEAD ASSEMBLY, JAR LID ASSEMBLY AND FOOD PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhejiang Shaoxing Supor Domestic Electrical Appliance Co., Ltd. 3 Shiji West Street Shaoxing, Zhejiang 312017 / CN | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIAO, Ping 3 Shiji West Street Shaoxing, Zhejiang 312017 / CN | 02 /
RUAN, Haoxiang 3 Shiji West Street Shaoxing, Zhejiang 312017 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | LLR 2, rue Jean Lantier 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20798481.6 | 27.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020CN87255 | Priority number, date | CN201910350996 | 28.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910350996 | CN201920600911U | 28.04.2019 Original published format: CN 201920600911 U | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020221208 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3962333 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A47J43/046, A47J43/07, A47J19/00 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
A47J43/0716 (EP,KR);
A47J43/046 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | LUFTABSAUG- UND DRUCKENTLASTUNGSANORDNUNG, VAKUUMKOPFANORDNUNG, BEHÄLTERDECKELANORDNUNG UND KÜCHENMASCHINE | [2022/10] | English: | AIR EXTRACTION AND PRESSURE RELEASE ASSEMBLY, VACUUM HEAD ASSEMBLY, JAR LID ASSEMBLY AND FOOD PROCESSOR | [2022/10] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'EXTRACTION D'AIR ET DE LIBÉRATION DE PRESSION, ENSEMBLE TÊTE À VIDE, ENSEMBLE COUVERCLE DE BOCAL ET ROBOT DE CUISINE | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 18.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN206213939U (ZHEJIANG SHAOXING SUPOR DOMESTIC ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD) [X] 1,2,13,16,17 * abstract *[I] 3-12,14,15; | [XI]CN109381068 (GUANGDONG MIDEA DOMESTIC ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-3,13,16,17 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-7 * [I] 4-12,14,15 | International search | [Y]CN208010550U (GUANGDONG MIDEA DOMESTIC ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1-23 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0068] and figures 1-8 *; | [A]US2018326378 (MOON JUNG S [US]) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [Y]CN109091035 (ZHEJIANG SHAOXING SUPOR DOMESTIC ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD) [Y] 1-23 * description, paragraphs [0004]-[0059] and figures 1-16 *; | [A]CN208551482U (GUANGDONG MIDEA DOMESTIC ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]CN208551508U (GUANGDONG MIDEA DOMESTIC ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]CN208769618U (GUANGDONG MIDEA DOMESTIC ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [PX]CN210043842U (ZHEJIANG SHAOXING SUPOR DOMESTIC ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD) [PX] 1-23 * claims 1-22, description, paragraphs [0053]-[0075] and figures 1-9 * | by applicant | CN109381068 |