EP3963926 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR CONFIGURATION OF MONITORING FOR TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ.) 16483 Stockholm / SE | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Wenliang No.1068 Tianshan Road West Changning District Shanghai 200335 / CN | 02 /
MERINO VAZQUEZ, Emiliano Avda. Francia, 25, 3D 28916 Leganes, Madrid / ES | 03 /
WASS, Mikael Kyrkstallsvaegen 19 511 69 Saetila / SE | 04 /
GAN, Juying No.1068 Tianshan Road West Changning District Shanghai 200335 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 20798624.1 | 29.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020CN87786 | Priority number, date | WO2019CN85329 | 30.04.2019 Original published format: PCT/CN2019/085329 | [2022/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020221297 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3963926 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, // H04W24/10, H04W60/02 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W60/02 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W24/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | H04W24/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR KONFIGURATION DER ÜBERWACHUNG EINER ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2022/10] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR CONFIGURATION OF MONITORING FOR TERMINAL DEVICE | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE CONFIGURATION DE SURVEILLANCE POUR ÉQUIPEMENT TERMINAL | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 06.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2016337841 (WON SUNG HWAN [KR], et al) [X] 1,19 * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0101] * * figures 4, 5 * [A] 16-18,20[I] 2-15; | [XI] - ERICSSON ET AL, "Subscription cancellation for group member UE", vol. SA WG2, no. Santa Cruz, Tenerife, Spain; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190219), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-1901581_GROUP_MEMBER_UE_CANCELLATION_23682_R16_V1.3, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRA, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F131%5FTenerife/Docs/S2%2D1901581%2Ezip, (20190219), XP051610188 [X] 1-9,11,13-20 * paragraph [5.6.1.3] - paragraph [5.6.1.4] * * paragraph [5.6.9] * * paragraph [6.5.9] * * figures 6.5.9-1 * * figures 5.18-1 * [I] 10,12 | International search | [A]CN102075900 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]CN102421080 (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]CN104144434 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015065128 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [PX] - Ericsson, "Enhancement of Monitoring Event configuration and Network Parameter Configuration", 3GPP Draft; S2-1906370, Reno, Nevada, USA, (20190517), pages 1 - 9, XP051743991 [PX] 1-23 * the whole document * | [X] - Ericsson, "Monitoring event cancellation due to TAU timer overwritten", 3GPP Draft S2-1903891, Xi’an, P.R.China, (20190412), vol. SA WG2, pages 1 - 7, XP051743092 [X] 1-23 * sections 5.6.1.4 and 5.18 * | [A] - Anonymous, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Architecture enhancements to facilitate communications with packet data networks and applications (Release 16)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Specification; 3GPP TS 23.682, (20190331), vol. SA WG2, no. V16.2.0, pages 1 - 126, XP051722869 [A] 1-23 * sections 4.5.6 and 5.6.1 * |