EP3942871 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SAVING POWER OF USER EQUIPMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Taehyoung 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
BAE, Taehan 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/41] |
Former [2022/04] | 01 /
KIM, Taehyoung Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
02 /
BAE, Taehan Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20799219.9 | 04.05.2020 | [2022/04] | WO2020KR05899 | Priority number, date | KR20190051866 | 02.05.2019 Original published format: KR 20190051866 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020222615 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3942871 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3942871 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W72/12 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
H04W52/0225 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W52/0212 (KR);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04W52/0245 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ENERGIESPAREN FÜR BENUTZERVORRICHTUNGEN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2022/04] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SAVING POWER OF USER EQUIPMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2022/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ÉCONOMISER L'ÉNERGIE D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2022/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 18.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24197040.9 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017325164 (LEE EUNJONG [KR], et al); | [X]KR20180090178 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | International search | [A]KR20180121350 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]WO2018204799 (CONVIDA WIRELESS LLC [US]); | [A]US2018332655 (ANG PETER PUI LOK [US], et al); | [A]WO2018210135 (VIVO MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2019063479 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2017325164 | WO2018143727 | WO2018204799 |