EP3965349 - SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2022/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REN, Xiaotao No. 29 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | 02 /
ZHAO, Rui No. 29 Xueyuan Rd., Haidian District Beijing 100083 / CN | [2022/10] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A., et al Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Fiorini, Andrea, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 20799254.6 | 21.04.2020 | [2022/10] | WO2020CN85827 | Priority number, date | CN201910363911 | 30.04.2019 Original published format: CN201910363911 | [2022/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020221061 | Date: | 05.11.2020 | Language: | ZH | [2020/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965349 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L27/26, H04B17/318, H04L25/02 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
H04L25/022 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
H04B17/318 (EP);
H04L25/0224 (EP,CN);
H04L25/0226 (CN,KR,US);
H04L27/0014 (CN,KR);
H04L27/261 (EP);
H04L27/2657 (EP);
H04L27/2675 (EP);
H04W52/325 (CN,KR);
H04W52/52 (CN,KR,US);
H04L2027/0026 (CN,KR,US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (EP);
H04L5/0057 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/10] | H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] | Title | German: | SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/10] | English: | SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2022/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2021 | Translation filed | 30.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 04.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004242174 (KIM HEA JOUNG [US], et al) [Y] 6,15 * claim 1 *; | [Y]US9332469 (DAVYDOV ALEXEI VLADIMIROVICH [RU], et al) [Y] 7,16 * column 7, lines 1-50 ** figure 9 *; | [Y]WO2018027982 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 6,15 * page 21, line 25 - page 22, line 7 *; | [Y]CN109391403 (NOKIA SOLUTIONS & NETWORKS OY, et al) [Y] 7,16 * paragraphs [0041] , [0043] - [0045] - [0070] , [0078] - [0080] - [0086] , [0087] *; | [XI] - LG ELECTRONICS, "Feature lead summary #3 for agenda item 7.2.4.1.1 Physical layer structure", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190303), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1903769 FEATURE LEAD SUMMARY #3 OF PHY STRUCTURE IN NR V2X, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG1%5FRL1/TSGR1%5F96/Docs/R1%2D1903769%2Ezip, (20190303), XP051691016 [X] 1,3-5,10,12-14,20,21 * pages 15-16 * [I] 2,11 | International search | [A]CN101578833 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-67* entire document *; | [A]CN103701730 (UNIV TSINGHUA) [A] 1-67 * entire document *; | [A]US2018324733 (CHAE HYUKJIN [KR]) [A] 1-67 * entire document *; | [A]CN109644025 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY) [A] 1-67 * entire document *; | [X] - CATT, "Discussion on physical layer structure in NR V2X", 3GPP Draft; R1-1901992, Athens, Greece, (20190301), pages 1 - 11, XP051599687 [X] 1-67 * part 7 * | [X] - Fujitsu, "Discussion on physical layer structure for NR sidelink", 3GPP Draft; R1-1901943, Athens, Greece, (20190301), pages 1 - 6, XP051599637 [X] 1-67 * section 2 * |