EP4052325 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONNECTING COMPONENTS OF A BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lisa Dräxlmaier GmbH Landshuter Strasse 100 84137 Vilsbiburg / DE | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÖMELSBERGER, Michael Feuereck 1 84494 Niedertaufkirchen / DE | 02 /
EGGEMANN, Thomas Im Burger Feld 38 84137 Vilsbiburg / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 20799658.8 | 27.10.2020 | [2022/36] | WO2020EP80099 | Priority number, date | DE201910129067 | 28.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019129067 | [2022/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021083852 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4052325 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/244, H01M50/204, H01M50/264, B23Q3/08, B25B11/00, H01M10/653 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
H01M50/244 (EP,CN);
H01M10/613 (CN);
H01M10/625 (CN);
H01M10/653 (EP);
H01M10/655 (CN);
H01M50/204 (EP);
H01M50/249 (CN);
H01M50/264 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN VON KOMPONENTEN EINER BATTERIE | [2022/36] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONNECTING COMPONENTS OF A BATTERY | [2022/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR RELIER DES COMPOSANTS DE BATTERIE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 26.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE10352037 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 9,10 * figure -; claims 2-7 *[A] 1-8 |