EP4055129 - LUBRICANT FOR A MARINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTALENERGIES ONETECH La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/26] |
Former [2022/37] | For all designated states TotalEnergies One Tech La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOYEN, Valérie TOTAL MARKETING SERVICES Centre de Recherche de Solaize Chemin du Canal - BP 22 69360 SOLAIZE / FR | 02 /
DE FEO, Modestino TOTAL MARKETING SERVICES Centre de Recherche de Solaize Chemin du Canal - BP 22 69360 SOLAIZE / FR | 03 /
CHAO, Gregory TOTAL MARKETING SERVICES Centre de Recherche de Solaize Chemin du Canal - BP 22 69360 SOLAIZE / FR | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/26] | Pact-IP 37, rue Royale 92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | ||
Former [2022/37] | Corizzi, Valérie PACT-IP 37, rue Royale 92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | Application number, filing date | 20799728.9 | 05.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020EP81072 | Priority number, date | EP20190315134 | 07.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19315134 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021089676 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055129 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4055129 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C10M105/60, C10M163/00, C10M169/04 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
C10M105/60 (EP,KR,US);
C10M169/045 (EP,KR,US);
C10M163/00 (EP,KR);
C10M2207/028 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2207/26 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2030/04 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2030/52 (EP,KR,US);
C10N2040/252 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C10M2207/028, C10N2010/04 (EP);
C10M2207/26, C10N2010/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHMIERMITTEL FÜR EINEN SCHIFFSMOTOR | [2022/37] | English: | LUBRICANT FOR A MARINE ENGINE | [2022/37] | French: | LUBRIFIANT POUR MOTEUR MARIN | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 09.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011092403 (LANCON DENIS [FR], et al); | [A]EP2540808 (BASF SE [DE]); | [A]US2016177216 (LANCON DENIS [FR], et al) | by applicant | US3814212 | US4205045 | WO2009153453 | WO2011042552 | WO2014180843 | WO2016066517 | WO2017148816 |