EP3973185 - PROGRESSIVE CAVITY PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seepex GmbH Scharnhölzstrasse 344 46240 Bottrop / DE | [2022/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARKING, Julian Brabecker Weg 36 46244 Bottrop / DE | [2022/13] | Representative(s) | Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2022/13] | Application number, filing date | 20800069.5 | 28.10.2020 | [2022/13] | WO2020EP80251 | Priority number, date | DE201910130981 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019130981 | [2022/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021094087 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3973185 | Date: | 30.03.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F04C2/107, F04C14/28 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
F04C2/1071 (EP,US);
F04C2/107 (US);
F04C14/28 (EP,US);
F04C2/1073 (EP);
F04C2/1075 (EP);
F04C2270/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/13] | Title | German: | EXZENTERSCHNECKENPUMPE | [2022/13] | English: | PROGRESSIVE CAVITY PUMP | [2022/13] | French: | POMPE À CAVITÉ PROGRESSIVE | [2022/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/13] | 20.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5679894 (KRUGER VOLKER [DE], et al); | [A]CN106812694 (UNIV SHANGHAI ENG SCIENCE); | [YD]DE102018102640 (SEEPEX GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE202005008989U | DE102005019063 | WO2009024279 | DE102010034440 | DE102014112552 | DE102015112248 | DE102018102640 |