EP4042222 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CORRECTING ABERRATIONS IN FLUORESCENCE MICROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abberior Instruments GmbH Hans-Adolf-Krebs-Weg 6 37077 Göttingen / DE | [2024/12] |
Former [2022/33] | For all designated states Abberior Instruments GmbH Hans-Adolf-Krebs-Weg 1 37077 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REUSS, Matthias Walkemühlenweg 15 37083 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
HEINE, Jörn Nordbahnhofstraße 2E 37213 Witzenhausen / DE | 03 /
WURM, Christian Pfaffenstück 51 37077 Göttingen / DE | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20800791.4 | 12.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020EP78627 | Priority number, date | DE20191007066 | 11.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019007066 | [2022/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021069743 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4042222 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4042222 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
G02B21/008 (EP,CN,US);
G02B21/0076 (EP,CN,US);
G01N21/6458 (CN,US);
G02B21/0032 (EP,US);
G02B21/0072 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABERRATIONSKORREKTUR IN DER FLUORESZENZMIKROSKOPIE | [2022/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CORRECTING ABERRATIONS IN FLUORESCENCE MICROSCOPY | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CORRECTION D'ABERRATION DANS UN MICROSCOPE À FLUORESCENCE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 25.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |