EP4059325 - PLASMA ARC TORCH WITH FOCUS HOLE ALIGNMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde GmbH Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEWERT, Erwan Stehackerweg 4 85283 Niederlauterbach / DE | 02 /
HUSSARY, Nakhleh, A. Henningweg 31 85737 Ismaning / DE | 03 /
WAGNER, Richard, Andreas Ligsalzstraße 5 80339 München / DE | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Lu, Jing Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20801154.4 | 05.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020EP25492 | Priority number, date | EP20190020625 | 11.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19020625 | [2022/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021093987 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4059325 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/34, H05H1/38 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
H05H1/34 (EP);
H05H1/3405 (EP,US);
H05H1/3423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Title | German: | PLASMALICHTBOGENBRENNER MIT FOKUSLOCHAUSRICHTUNG | [2022/38] | English: | PLASMA ARC TORCH WITH FOCUS HOLE ALIGNMENT | [2022/38] | French: | CHALUMEAU À ARC DE PLASMA AYANT UN ALIGNEMENT PAR TROUS DE MISE AU POINT | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 21.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0553780U (NIPPON STEEL WELDING INDUSTRY CO., LTD.) [A] 1-5,7,9-16 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0048] *; | [Y]DE4407913 (SOUDURE AUTOGENE FRANCAISE [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4,7,9-11,14-16 * figures 1-7 * * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 67 *; | [A]EP0801882 (HYPERTHERM INC [US]) [A] 1-5,7,9-16 * figures 1-3C ** paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0044] *; | [A]WO03089183 (THERMAL DYNAMICS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7,9-16 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0202] * * figures 1-51 *; | [Y]EP2293655 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,7,9-11,14-16 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0028] *; | [A]US8395076 (MATUS TIM A [US]) [A] 1-5,7,9-16 * figures 2-4 * * column 2, line 9 - column 6, line 65 *; | [A]US2017042013 (SANDERS NICHOLAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7,9-16 * figures 1-31 * * paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0201] * |