EP3965794 - ANTIBIOTIC CANNABINOID-TERPENE FORMULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of British Columbia University Industry Liaison Office 103-6190 Agronomy Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1Z3 / CA | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMPSON, Charles J. Vancouver, British Columbia V6K 1C1 / CA | 02 /
PRYJMA, Mark C. Ajax, Ontario L1S 5A4 / CA | 03 /
LAMBERT, Dana M. Vancouver, British Columbia V7W 2H7 / CA | 04 /
DOSANJH, Manisha Surrey, British Columbia V3X 1S9 / CA | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20801856.4 | 06.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020CA50613 | Priority number, date | US201962843687P | 06.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962843687 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020223811 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965794 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/352, A61K31/05, A61K38/15, A61K31/015, A61K36/185, A61P1/02, A61P31/04, A61M31/00, C07C13/271, C07C13/32, C07C39/19, C07C39/23, C07D311/58, C07K7/08, A61K38/12 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/015 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/352 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/05 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/658 (KR,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/12 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P1/02 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/015, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/05, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/12, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/11] | A61K38/15, A61K31/015, A61K31/05, A61K31/352, A61K36/185, A61M31/00, A61P1/02, A61P31/04, C07C13/271, C07C13/32, C07C39/19, C07C39/23, C07D311/58, C07K7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | ANTIBIOTISCHE CANNABINOID-TERPEN-FORMULIERUNGEN | [2022/11] | English: | ANTIBIOTIC CANNABINOID-TERPENE FORMULATIONS | [2022/11] | French: | FORMULATIONS ANTIBIOTIQUES À BASE DE CANNABINOÏDE ET DE TERPÈNE | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 06.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016250270 (WENDSCHUH MICHAEL VICTOR [US], et al); | [X]EP3261629 (EBBU LLC [US]); | [XY]US2018344661 (FINLEY CONSTANCE [US], et al); | [XY]WO2018234301 (UNIV SYDDANSK [DK]); | [YP]WO2019198056 (BUZZELET DEVELOPMENT AND TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IL]); | International search | [X]WO2018234301 (UNIV SYDDANSK [DK]); | [PX]WO2020000024 (BOTANIX PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [AU]); | [PX]WO2020051284 (NEMUS BIOSCIENCE INC [US], et al) |