EP3965792 - HMGB1 ANTAGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Feinstein Institutes for Medical Research 350 Community Drive Manhasset, NY 11030 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AL-ABED, Yousef 350 Community Drive Manhasset NY 11030 / US | 02 /
YANG, Huan 350 Community Drive Manhasset NY 11030 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 20802214.5 | 08.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020US32025 | Priority number, date | US201962845568P | 09.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962845568 P | US201962845576P | 09.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962845576 P | US201962845578P | 09.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962845578 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020227603 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965792 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/07, A61K31/7024, A61P29/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
A61P25/02 (EP,IL,US);
A61K38/17 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/197 (EP,IL,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,IL,US);
A61K38/07 (IL,US);
A61K47/10 (IL,US);
A61K47/20 (EP,IL);
A61K47/26 (IL,US);
A61K47/65 (IL,US);
A61K9/0014 (IL,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/0043 (IL,US);
A61K9/0053 (IL,US);
A61K9/007 (IL,US);
A61K9/08 (EP,IL,US);
C07K1/113 (IL,US);
C07K14/4703 (IL,US);
C07K5/06069 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | HMGB1-ANTAGONIST | [2022/11] | English: | HMGB1 ANTAGONIST | [2022/11] | French: | ANTAGONISTE DE HMGB1 | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 06.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016094899 (THE FEINSTEIN INST MEDICAL RES [US]); | International search | [A]US9186371 (TANIGUCHI TADATSUGU [JP], et al); | [A]WO2016094899 (THE FEINSTEIN INST MEDICAL RES [US]); | [A]US2018344808 (TRACEY KEVIN J [US], et al); | by applicant | US4160452 | US4256108 | US4265874 | WO9011757 | US5007790 | WO9318755 | US5582837 | WO9747285 | WO9811879 | WO9855107 | US5972389 | WO0132217 | WO0156544 | WO0197783 | US6340475 | WO0232416 | US2002051820 | US6451808 | US6488962 | WO02096404 | US2003039688 | US2003044466 | WO03035041 | WO03035040 | WO03035029 | WO03035177 | WO03035039 | US2003104062 | US2003104053 | US2003147952 | US8138141 | US19680628455 | US19760628455 |