EP3966484 - SYSTEM PULSATION DAMPENER DEVICE(S) SUBSTITUTING FOR PULSATION DAMPENERS UTILIZING COMPRESSION MATERIAL THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Performance Pulsation Control, Inc. 3309 Essex Drive Suite 200 Richardson, Texas 75182 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROGERS, John Thomas 1214 Creekwood Drive Garland, Texas 75044 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20802300.2 | 04.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020US31335 | Priority number, date | US201916404248 | 06.05.2019 Original published format: US201916404248 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020227223 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966484 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/04, E21B21/01, F04B11/00, F04B23/06, F04D7/00, F04D13/12, F04D29/66, F16L55/027, F16L55/033, F16L55/053, F16L55/05, // F04B15/02 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
F16L55/053 (EP);
E21B21/01 (EP);
F04B11/0008 (EP);
F04B11/0025 (EP);
F04B11/0033 (EP);
F04B11/0091 (EP);
F04B23/06 (EP);
F16L55/02718 (EP);
F16L55/02727 (EP);
F16L55/0332 (EP);
F16L55/05 (EP);
F04B15/02 (EP);
F04D13/12 (EP);
F04D29/669 (EP);
F04D7/00 (EP);
F05D2250/52 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | F16L55/04, F16L55/05, E21B21/01 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | SYSTEMPULSATIONSDÄMPFER ALS ERSATZ FÜR PULSATIONSDÄMPFER MIT KOMPRESSIONSMATERIAL DARIN | [2022/11] | English: | SYSTEM PULSATION DAMPENER DEVICE(S) SUBSTITUTING FOR PULSATION DAMPENERS UTILIZING COMPRESSION MATERIAL THEREIN | [2022/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF(S) AMORTISSEURS DE PULSATIONS DE SYSTÈME SUBSTITUANT À DES AMORTISSEURS DE PULSATIONS UTILISANT UN MATÉRIAU DE COMPRESSION À L'INTÉRIEUR DE CELUI-CI | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 17.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012189477 (ROGERS JOHN THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-12 * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]US2015096639 (ROGERS JOHN THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 ** paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]US2015240982 (EISNER BLAKE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-23 * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0063] *; | [A]US2018128410 (ROGERS JOHN THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0047] *; | [X]US2019128462 (ROGERS JOHN THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-9 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0056] * | International search | [A]US4585400 (MILLER JAMES D [US]) [A] 1-20* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2018128410 (ROGERS JOHN THOMAS [US]) [Y] 1-20 * ; figure 4; paragraph [0032-0034] *; | [Y]WO2019083736 (PERFORMANCE PULSATION CONTROL INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * ; figure 1; paragraph [0025]; claim 1 *; | [PX]US2019257462 (ROGERS JOHN THOMAS [US]) [PX] 1-20 * ; entire document *; | [PX]US2020132237 (ROGERS JOHN THOMAS [US]) [PX] 1-20 * ; entire document * |