EP3968562 - COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARUYAMA Tatsuya c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
KIDO Mitsuyasu c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA Shoji c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
TAKAMI Kazuhisa c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 05 /
ENDO Takamichi c/o HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20802540.3 | 13.02.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020JP05572 | Priority number, date | JP20190088847 | 09.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019088847 | [2022/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020225954 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3968562 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/00, H04J3/06 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H04J3/0667 (EP);
H04L7/0033 (US);
H04L7/04 (US)
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | H04L7/00, H04L12/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/11] | English: | COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | [2022/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2021 | Translation filed | 09.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 20.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014016474 (BEHESHTI-ZAVAREH NEDA [US], et al) [Y] 5,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] *; | [XY]CN105376043 (WUHAN NARI LTD LIABILITY CO OF STATE GRID ELECTRIC POWER RES INST) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-14 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * [Y] 5,11; | [A] - BIN LUO ZTE CORPORATION P R CHINA, "Proposal on precision time synchronization layer OAM;WD 59", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2013-2016, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20151104), vol. 13/15, pages 1 - 8, XP044148587 [A] 1-14 * page 4 - page 6 * | International search | [A]JP2011071735 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-14; | [A]JP2014238357 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-14 * ) 1 *; | [A]JP2016116143 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-14; | [A]JP2018155679 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-14; | [A] - EXEL, REINHARD, "Mitigation of Asymmetric Link Delays in IEEE 1588 Clock Synchronization Systems", IEEE, vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1109/LCOMM.2014.012214.132540, pages 507 - 510, URL: https://ieeexplore.ieee.org/stamp/stamp.jsp?tp=&arnumber=6784558, XP011544857 [A] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCOMM.2014.012214.132540 | [A] - Masashi Ito, Yasuyuki Kozakai, "The Clarification and Verification of The Mechanism Mitigating Packet Delay Variation for Time Synchronization", IEICE Technical Report, (20120913), vol. 112, no. 209 (IN2012-55), pages 33 - 38, XP009530708 [A] 1-14 |