EP3965787 - ADENOVIRAL POLYPEPTIDE IX INCREASES ADENOVIRAL GENE THERAPY VECTOR PRODUCTIVITY AND INFECTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuopio Center For Gene and Cell Therapy OY Microkatu 1 70210 Kuopio / FI | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURKKI, Vesa Microkatu 1 70210, Kuopio / FI | 02 /
LEPOLA, Saana Microkatu 1 70210, Kuopio / FI | 03 /
LESCH, Hanna Microkatu 1 70210, Kuopio / FI | 04 /
YLA-HERTTUALA, Seppo Microkatu 1 70210, Kuopio / FI | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2022/11] | Application number, filing date | 20802600.5 | 01.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020US30924 | Priority number, date | US201962844175P | 07.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962844175 P | US201916423215 | 28.05.2019 Original published format: US201916423215 | US201916569742 | 13.09.2019 Original published format: US201916569742 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020227049 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965787 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/761, A61K48/00, C12N15/861 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/005 (IL,KR,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61K48/005 (EP,IL);
A61K48/0066 (IL,US);
A61K48/0091 (IL,US);
C12N5/0603 (IL,US);
C12N5/0686 (KR);
C12N7/025 (EP,IL);
C12N2510/00 (IL,KR,US);
C12N2511/00 (KR);
C12N2710/00052 (IL,US);
C12N2710/10022 (IL,US);
C12N2710/10023 (IL,US);
C12N2710/10034 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Extension states | BA | 10.11.2021 | ME | 10.11.2021 | Validation states | KH | 10.11.2021 | MA | 10.11.2021 | MD | 10.11.2021 | TN | 10.11.2021 | Title | German: | ADENOVIRUS-POLYPEPTID-IX ERHÖHT DIE PRODUKTIVITÄT UND INFEKTIOSITÄT VON ADENOVIRALEM GENTHERAPIEVEKTOR | [2022/11] | English: | ADENOVIRAL POLYPEPTIDE IX INCREASES ADENOVIRAL GENE THERAPY VECTOR PRODUCTIVITY AND INFECTIVITY | [2022/11] | French: | LE POLYPEPTIDE IX DES ADÉNOVIRUS AUGMENTE LA PRODUCTIVITÉ ET L'INFECTIVITÉ DES VECTEURS DE THÉRAPIE GÉNIQUE DE TYPE ADÉNOVIRUS | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 13.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9957296 (GENZYME CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5880102 (GEORGE SAMUEL E [US], et al) [Y] 7, 22, 38, 54, 75 * entire document *; | [Y]US2004038403 (OTTO EDWARD [US]) [Y] 90 * entire document *; | [XY]US2009253184 (CLARKE PETER [US], et al) [X] 1-6, 8-10, 13-21, 23-25, 28-37, 39, 40, 43-53, 55-57, 60-74, 76-78, 81-89 * entire document * [Y] 7, 11, 12, 22, 26, 27, 38, 41, 42, 54, 58, 59, 75, 79, 80, 90; | [Y]US2018002385 (GARCIA-SASTRE ADOLFO [US], et al) [Y] 12, 27, 42, 59, 80 * entire document *; | [Y]US2019127758 (CHAMBERLAIN JEFFREY S [US], et al) [Y] 11, 26, 41, 58, 79 * entire document *; | [PX]US2019315808 (TURKKI VESA [FI], et al) [PX] 1-90* entire document * |