EP3966224 - METHODS FOR THE FRACTIONATION OF PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Sydney Sydney NSW 2006 / AU | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARANCE, Mark The University of Sydney Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20802944.7 | 06.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020AU50444 | Priority number, date | AU20190901536 | 06.05.2019 Original published format: AU 2019901536 | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020223761 | Date: | 12.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3966224 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/16, G01N33/483, C07K1/36, G01N33/68 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
G01N33/6848 (EP,AU);
G01N33/74 (EP,AU);
C07K1/22 (US);
C07K1/14 (US);
C07K1/145 (EP,US);
C07K1/16 (AU);
C07K1/34 (EP,AU);
C07K1/36 (AU,US);
C07K14/575 (US);
C07K14/62 (US);
C12P21/06 (US);
G01N2333/62 (EP,AU);
G01N2800/02 (AU);
G01N2800/04 (AU);
G01N2800/042 (EP);
G01N33/90 (AU)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FRAKTIONIERUNG VON PROTEINEN | [2022/11] | English: | METHODS FOR THE FRACTIONATION OF PROTEINS | [2022/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FRACTIONNEMENT DE PROTÉINES | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 01.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 16.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1214891 (LILLY CO ELI [US]); | [X]US3953290 (UTHNE KNUT OIVIND, et al); | [X]CN104292305 (UNIV HENAN SCIENCE & TECH); | International search | [X]WO9115223 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [X]WO9731943 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [X]US2006188956 (CHEN JINGCAI [CN], et al); |