EP3876181 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rakuten Group, Inc. 1-14-1 Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | [2023/36] |
Former [2021/36] | For all designated states Rakuten Group, Inc. 1-14-1 Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 1580094 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAULTANI, Dinesh c/o Rakuten, Inc. 1-14-1, Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | 02 /
CHARRON, Bruno Andre c/o Rakuten, Inc. 1-14-1, Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | [2023/36] |
Former [2021/36] | 01 /
DAULTANI, Dinesh c/o Rakuten, Inc. 1-14-1, Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | ||
02 /
CHARRON, Bruno André c/o Rakuten, Inc. 1-14-1, Tamagawa Setagaya-ku Tokyo 158-0094 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 20803073.4 | 20.01.2020 | [2021/36] | WO2020JP01767 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021149118 | Date: | 29.07.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876181 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3876181 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q40/04, G06N3/04 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
G06Q40/04 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0202 (US);
G06N3/126 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND ZUGEHÖRIGES PROGRAMM | [2023/24] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2021/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, ET PROGRAMME | [2021/36] |
Former [2023/24] | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND PROGRAM THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2020 | Translation filed | 16.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 21.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.03.2023 | 07.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | LU | 20.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SI | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - CHUNG HYEJUNG ET AL, "Genetic algorithm-optimized multi-channel convolutional neural network for stock market prediction", NEURAL COMPUTING AND APPLICATIONS, SPRINGER LONDON, LONDON, vol. 32, no. 12, doi:10.1007/S00521-019-04236-3, ISSN 0941-0643, (20190520), pages 7897 - 7914, (20190520), XP037169487 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 7898 - page 7909 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00521-019-04236-3 | International search | [A]JP2008204103 (NAT UNIV YOKOHAMA, et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037]-[0058] *; | [A]JP2012525650 (GENETIC FINANCE (BARBADOS) LIMITED) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025]-[0031], [0036]-[0041], [0049]-[0057] *; | [A] - Ato, Et Al., "Majority Voting Strategy for Foreign Exchange Trading using Multiobjective GA", IPSJ SIG Technical Reports: Mathematical Modeling and Problem Solving, (20161212), IPSJ SIG Technical Reports: Mathematical Modeling and Problem Solving, URL: https://ipsj.ixsq.nii.ac.jp/ej/?action=repository_uri&item_id=176331&file_id=1&file_no=1, (20210921), XP055843363 [A] 1-15 | [A] - Tsujioka Suguru, Yamamoto Kohji, "A Study on Index which Evaluates Automatic Trading Rules", The 7th JSAI Special Interest Group on Financial Informatics (SIG-FIN), (20130221), pages 26 - 30, The 7th JSAI Special Interest Group on Financial Informatics (SIG-FIN), URL: https://sigfin.org/?plugin=attach&refer=SIG-FIN-007-05&openfile=SIG-FIN-007-05.pdf, XP055843362 [A] 7 | by applicant | WO2006085460 |