EP4070396 - ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITION WITH FLUORINATED ACYCLIC ESTER AND FLUORINATED CYCLIC CARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYENSQO SA Rue de la Fusée 98 1130 Brussels / BE | [2024/09] |
Former [2022/41] | For all designated states SOLVAY SA Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Hyun-Cheol 1802ho-107dong, 21, Deogyeong-daero 1484beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-city Gyeonggi-do 16689 / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Hyung-Kwon 4th floor, 16, Seongsan-ro 24-gil Seodaemun-gu Seoul 03759 / KR | 03 /
MOON, Eun-Ji 4th floor, 16, Seongsan-ro 24-gil Seodaemun-gu Seoul 03759 / KR | 04 /
HOUGH, Lawrence, Alan 103 -1203, Pentraus, 172 Shingongdeok-dong Mapo- gu Seoul 04194 / KR | 05 /
WON, Du-Hyun Moamiraedo apartment 504-1502 87 Osongsaengmyeong 3-ro Haungdeok-gu Cheongju-si Chungcheongbuk-do 28165 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Jong-Hyun 47, Sowon-ro, Deogyang-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 10522 / KR | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Viola, Laura Maria Syensqo S.A. Viale Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/41] | Viola, Laura Maria Solvay S.A. Intellectual Property Department Viale Lombardia, 20 20021 Bollate (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 20803589.9 | 13.11.2020 | [2022/41] | WO2020EP82009 | Priority number, date | EP20190213035 | 03.12.2019 Original published format: EP 19213035 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021110384 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070396 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/583, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0567 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
H01M10/0567 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0568 (US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M4/362 (EP);
H01M4/364 (KR);
H01M4/386 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/483 (KR);
H01M4/583 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (KR);
H01M2004/027 (KR);
H01M2220/20 (KR);
H01M2220/30 (KR);
H01M2300/0028 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT FLUORIERTEM ACYCLISCHEM ESTER UND FLUORIERTEM CYCLISCHEM CARBONAT | [2022/41] | English: | ELECTROLYTE COMPOSITION WITH FLUORINATED ACYCLIC ESTER AND FLUORINATED CYCLIC CARBONATE | [2022/41] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ÉLECTROLYTE À ESTER ACYCLIQUE FLUORÉ ET CARBONATE CYCLIQUE FLUORÉ | [2022/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2022 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 04.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]JP2018101612 (GS YUASA CORP, et al) [YD] 1-6,8-14* par. 91 *; | [Y]WO2019211353 (SOLVAY [BE]) [Y] 1-6,8-14 * page 2, lines 14-25; page 18, line 23-25; page 20, table 1, examples 1-3; page 21, lines 21-25; page 25, table 2 * | by applicant | WO2009040367 | WO2013033579 | US2014017572 | JP2018092785 | JP2018101612 | - MYUNG-JIN CHUNHYUNGMIN PARKSOOJIN PARKNAM-SOON CHOI, RSC Adv., (20130000), vol. 3, page 21320 | - CAS, no. 1133129-90-4 |