EP4058721 - LIGHTING MODULE FOR LATERAL PART OF A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Vision 34,rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEEV, Kostadin 34, Rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | 02 /
MEYRENAUD, Jean Luc 34, Rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | 03 /
XUE, Jingjing 34, Rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | 04 /
ANDRE, Stephane 34, Rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | 05 /
PELLARIN, Marie 34, Rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [2023/44] |
Former [2022/38] | 01 /
BEEV, Kostadin 34, Rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | ||
02 /
MEYRENAUD, Jean Luc 34, Rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | |||
03 /
XUE, Jingjing 34, Rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | |||
04 /
ANDRE, Stephane 34, Rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | |||
05 /
PELLARIN, Marie 34, Rue Saint André 93012 BOBIGNY Cedex / FR | Representative(s) | Valeo Visibility Service Propriété Industrielle c/o Valeo Vision 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 20803616.0 | 13.11.2020 | [2022/38] | WO2020EP82121 | Priority number, date | FR20190012758 | 15.11.2019 Original published format: FR 1912758 | FR20190014549 | 16.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1914549 | [2022/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021094574 | Date: | 20.05.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4058721 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4058721 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F21S43/20, F21S43/14, G02B19/00, B60Q1/26, B60R1/12, F21S41/25, G02B3/04, B60Q1/24, B60Q1/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
F21S43/14 (EP,US);
B60Q1/0035 (EP);
B60Q1/249 (EP,US);
B60Q1/2665 (EP);
B60R1/1207 (EP,US);
F21S43/26 (EP,US);
G02B19/0014 (EP);
G02B19/0061 (EP);
G02B3/04 (EP);
B60R2001/1253 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSMODUL FÜR EIN SEITENTEIL EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2022/38] | English: | LIGHTING MODULE FOR LATERAL PART OF A VEHICLE | [2022/38] | French: | MODULE D'ÉCLAIRAGE POUR PARTIE LATÉRALE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2022/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/38] | 06.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2614969 (CIBIE PROJECTEURS [FR]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2639294 (CARELLO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0945306 (RENAULT VEHICULES IND [FR]) [A] 1-21* the whole document *; | [A]US2002041498 (FURST PETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US2007029563 (AMANO YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]CN201599722U (SUZHOU ZHONGZE OPTOELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]CN201875628U (KEMEI ADHESIVE MATERIAL SHENZHEN CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US2011235338 (CHEN KUAN-HUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0020] , [0022]; figures 3,5 *; | [A]US2011320024 (LIN LUNG-SHENG [TW], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US2012229645 (YAMADA MASAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]CN202613315U (SHENZHEN HETEC ENERGY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US8840270 (SCHWALENBERG SIMON [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2935982 (MUTEKI S R L [IT]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102015009875 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]DE102017007761 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018172238 (CAMRAS MICHAEL DAVID [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]DE102018201043 (OSRAM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]WO2019150011 (PSA AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [A] 1-21 * abstract * | Examination | WO2020083665 |