EP4041144 - EXPANDABLE SHEATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.04.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Lifesciences Corporation One Edwards Way Irvine, CA 92614-5688 / US | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUMANN, Yair, A. Caesarea Business Park 8 Haeshel Street 30889 Caesarea / IL | 02 /
GOLDBERG, Eran Caesarea Business Park 8 Haeshel Street 30889 Caesarea / IL | 03 /
DVORSKY, Anatoly Caesarea Business Park 8 Haeshel Street 30889 Caesarea / IL | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20804020.4 | 07.10.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020US54594 | Priority number, date | US201962912569P | 08.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962912569 P | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021071960 | Date: | 15.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4041144 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/962, A61F2/966, A61M25/00 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
A61F2/9522 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61F2/962 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61F2/2436 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61F2/243 (CN);
A61F2/958 (CN);
A61F2/966 (CN);
A61M25/0012 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M25/0023 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M25/0045 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61M25/005 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61M25/0668 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M29/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61F2002/9623 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61F2002/9665 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61M2025/0024 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61M2025/0293 (EP,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | DEHNBARE HÜLLE | [2022/33] | English: | EXPANDABLE SHEATH | [2022/33] | French: | GAINE EXTENSIBLE | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 08.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010004631 (ZHOU PU [US]) [A] 49-62 * paragraphs [0031] - [0038]; figure - *; | [A]US2013297007 (KUCHELA ARUN [US]) [A] 6 * figure 8A *; | [A]US2017014157 (COYLE JAMES [IE], et al) [A] 6 * figure 13 *; | [AD]US2019029820 (ZHOU PU [US], et al) [AD] 49-62* paragraphs [0057] , [0058]; figure -; claim - *; | [XAI]US2019247627 (KORKUCH CHRISTOPHER NASON [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,17-48 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 15] , [0 21] , [0 35] , [ 161]; figure 50 * [A] 6 [I] 9-16 | by applicant | US2012123529 | US2012239142 | US2014379067 | US2016296730 | US2018008407 | US2018153689 |