EP4048857 - METHOD FOR PLUGGING AND ABANDONING OIL AND GAS WELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board of Regents, The University of Texas System 201 West 7th Street Austin, TX 78701 / US | For all designated states PQ LLC 300 Lindenwood Drive Valleybrooke Corporate Center Malvern, Pennsylvania 19355-1740 / US | [2022/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN OORT, Eric 12000 Kirkland Court Bee Cave, Texas 78738 / US | 02 /
MCDONALD, Michael 214 Humbercrest Blvd. Toronto, Ontario M6S4L3 / CA | [2022/35] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/35] | Application number, filing date | 20804134.3 | 23.10.2020 | [2022/35] | WO2020US56999 | Priority number, date | US201962925287P | 24.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962925287 P | [2022/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021081290 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4048857 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4048857 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/13, C09K8/46, C04B103/00, C04B28/26, C09K8/42 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
E21B33/13 (EP);
C09K8/426 (US);
C04B28/26 (EP);
C09K8/46 (EP,US);
E21B33/14 (US);
C04B2103/0008 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/26, C04B22/062, C04B22/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | E21B33/13, C09K8/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STOPFEN UND AUFGEBEN VON ERDÖL- UND ERDGASBOHRLÖCHERN | [2023/14] | English: | METHOD FOR PLUGGING AND ABANDONING OIL AND GAS WELLS | [2022/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OBTURATION ET D'ABANDON DE PUITS DE FORAGE DE PÉTROLE ET DE GAZ | [2023/14] |
Former [2022/35] | VERFAHREN ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN UND AUFGEBEN VON ÖL- UND GASBOHRLÖCHERN | ||
Former [2022/35] | PROCÉDÉ D'OBTURATION ET D'ABANDON DE PUITS DE PÉTROLE ET DE GAZ | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 28.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | GR | 01.12.2023 | |
IS | 30.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016237779 (HUSBY TOVE [NO], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]NO20161177 (ARCHER OILTOOLS AS [NO]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A] - Kristian Moum Skjerve, "Evaluation of Shale Formations as Barrier Element for Permanent Plug and Abandonment of Wells", (20130601), URL: https://brage.bibsys.no/xmlui/bitstream/handle/11250/2400752/9368_FULLTEXT.pdf?sequence=1&isAllowed=y, (20180125), XP055444585 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - STEPHEN WILLIAMS ET AL, "Identification and Qualification of Shale Annular Barriers Using Wireline Logs During Plug and Abandonment Operations", SPE/IADC DRILLING CONFERENCE AND EXHIBITION, (20090317), doi:10.2118/119321-MS, XP055444947 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2118/119321-MS |