EP4065297 - A STEEL CORD CUT END PREPARATION DEVICE AND A WELDING MACHINE FOR WELDING STEEL CORD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NV Bekaert SA Bekaertstraat 2 8550 Zwevegem / BE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, Lingfeng No. 5 Dong Wai Huan Road Binjiang Economic Development Zone Jiangyin, Jiangsu Province 214434 / CN | 02 /
HUANG, Guoqing No. 89 Huadong Road Jiangyin, Jiangsu Province 214400 / CN | 03 /
XU, Ming 98 Hongtong Road Changshan Jiangyin, Jiangsu Province 214429 / CN | 04 /
LIU, Junhu Bekaertstraat 2 PC6030 - BTC 8550 Zwevegem / BE | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Serwas, Harry NV Bekaert SA IPD - PC6030 Bekaertstraat 2 8550 Zwevegem / BE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20804270.5 | 10.11.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020EP81637 | Priority number, date | CN20192259266U | 26.11.2019 Original published format: CN 201922059266 U | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021104853 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4065297 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4065297 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B21F7/00, B21F11/00 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
B21F7/00 (EP,US);
B21F11/00 (EP,US);
B23K11/0026 (EP,US);
B23K20/004 (EP,US);
B23K2101/32 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÄPARATIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR STAHLKORDSCHNITTENDE UND SCHWEISSMASCHINE ZUM SCHWEISSEN VON STAHLKORD | [2022/40] | English: | A STEEL CORD CUT END PREPARATION DEVICE AND A WELDING MACHINE FOR WELDING STEEL CORD | [2022/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRÉPARATION D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE COUPE DE CÂBLE D'ACIER ET MACHINE DE SOUDAGE POUR SOUDER UN CÂBLE D'ACIER | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 19.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.2024 | BG | 03.01.2024 | HR | 03.01.2024 | LT | 03.01.2024 | LV | 03.01.2024 | NL | 03.01.2024 | PL | 03.01.2024 | SE | 03.01.2024 | NO | 03.04.2024 | RS | 03.04.2024 | GR | 04.04.2024 | IS | 03.05.2024 | PT | 03.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
LV | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
PL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
PT | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 03.01.2024 | |
BG | 03.01.2024 | ||
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 03.01.2024 | |
HR | 03.01.2024 | ||
LT | 03.01.2024 | ||
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
RS | 03.04.2024 | ||
GR | 04.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 03.01.2024 | |
NL | 03.01.2024 | ||
NO | 03.04.2024 | ||
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 03.01.2024 | |
IS | 03.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 03.01.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE884615 (MESSERSCHMITT AG); | [Y]FR2184241 (BENNES MARREL [FR]); | [IY]JPH02247081 (BRIDGESTONE BEKARUTO STEEL KOO); | [Y]WO2015144427 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]); | [Y]WO2019137856 (BEKAERT SA NV [BE]) | by applicant | JPH0247081B |