EP4055944 - UPDATING ACTIVE TCI STATE FOR SINGLE-PDCCH BASED MULTI-TRP PDSCH OR MULTI-PDCCH BASED MULTI-TRP PDSCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURUGANATHAN, Siva 275 Denali Way Stittsville, Ontario K2S 0R3 / CA | 02 /
FRENNE, Mattias Arkeologvägen 20 754 43 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
GAO, Shiwei 78 Dragon Park Drive Nepean, Ontario K2J 0H5 / CA | 04 /
MÄÄTTÄNEN, Helka-Liina Vallilantie 25 b 2 00510 Helsinki / FI | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | Laqua, Bernd Christian Kurt Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20804356.2 | 04.11.2020 | [2022/37] | WO2020IB60371 | Priority number, date | US201962933049P | 08.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962933049 P | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021090204 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055944 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04L5/00, H04B7/08 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0098 (EP,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04B7/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | AKTUALISIERUNG DES AKTIVEN TCI-STATUS FÜR EINZEL-PDCCH-BASIERTEN MULTI-TRP-PDSCH ODER MULTI-PDCCH-BASIERTEN MULTI-TRP-PDSCH | [2022/37] | English: | UPDATING ACTIVE TCI STATE FOR SINGLE-PDCCH BASED MULTI-TRP PDSCH OR MULTI-PDCCH BASED MULTI-TRP PDSCH | [2022/37] | French: | MISE À JOUR D'ÉTAT DE TCI ACTIF POUR PDSCH MULTI-TRP BASÉ SUR UN SEUL PDCCH OU PDSCH MULTI-TRP BASÉ SUR DE MULTIPLES PDCCH | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2021 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 19.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - ZTE, "Enhancements on Multi-TRP and Multi-panel Transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. Chongqing, China; 20191014 - 20191020, (20191005), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1910284 ENHANCEMENTS ON MULTI-TRP AND MULTI-PANEL TRANSMISSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98b/Docs/R1-1910284.zip, (20191005), XP051808478 [Y] 1-13,17,27,33-48 * page 1/20, section 2.1; pages 5/20 and 10/20, section 2.2 * | [Y] - "5G; NR; Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (3GPP TS 38.321 version 15.3.0 Release 15)", vol. 3GPP RAN, no. V15.3.0, (20180928), pages 1 - 77, ETSI TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.etsi.org/deliver/etsi_ts/138300_138399/138321/15.03.00_60/ts_138321v150300p.pdf, (20180928), XP014330483 [Y] 1-13,16,26,33-48 * section 6.1.3.14 * | [Y] - Etsi Etsi 3gpp, "3GPP TS 38.214 version 15.3.0 Release 15", (20181001), URL: https://www.etsi.org/deliver/etsi_ts/138200_138299/138214/15.03.00_60/ts_138214v150300p.pdf, (20210121), XP055767408 [Y] 1-13,16,26,33-48 * page 26, section 5.1.5 * | [XYI] - MCC SUPPORT, "Draft Report of 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #98bis v0.1.0 (Chongqing, China, 14th - 20th October 2019)", vol. RAN WG1, no. Reno, USA; 20191118 - 20191122, (20191023), 3GPP DRAFT; DRAFT_MINUTES_REPORT_RAN1#98B_V010, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: https://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_98b/Report/Draft_Minutes_report_RAN1%2398b_v010.zip, (20191023), XP051798974 [X] 13-15,19-25,29-32 * pages 104/148, 105/148, 9/148 * [Y] 16,17,26,27 [I] 18,28 |