EP4244580 - FUNCTIONAL INTERFACE FOR PROVIDING A FUNCTION ACCORDING TO SENSOR MEASUREMENT VALUES, AND SENSOR FOR PROVIDING MEASUREMENT VALUES TO A FUNCTIONAL INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.05.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | 12.01.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstr. 1 - 5 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÄMER, Florian 77796 Mühlenbach / DE | 02 /
HEIZMANN, Patrick 77709 Oberwolfach / DE | 03 /
ALLGAIER, Stefan 77709 Oberwolfach / DE | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstraße 87 50968 Köln / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 20804525.2 | 10.11.2020 | [2023/38] | WO2020EP81676 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022100821 | Date: | 19.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4244580 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01D21/00 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
G01D21/00 (EP);
G01F23/284 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Title | German: | FUNKTIONSSCHNITTSTELLE ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER FUNKTION ABHÄNGIG VON SENSORMESSWERTEN SOWIE SENSOR ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON MESSWERTEN AN EINE FUNKTIONSSCHNITTSTELLE | [2023/38] | English: | FUNCTIONAL INTERFACE FOR PROVIDING A FUNCTION ACCORDING TO SENSOR MEASUREMENT VALUES, AND SENSOR FOR PROVIDING MEASUREMENT VALUES TO A FUNCTIONAL INTERFACE | [2023/38] | French: | INTERFACE FONCTIONNELLE POUR LA FOURNITURE D'UNE FONCTION EN FONCTION DE VALEURS DE MESURE DE CAPTEUR, ET CAPTEUR POUR LA FOURNITURE DE VALEURS DE MESURE À UNE INTERFACE FONCTIONNELLE | [2023/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 19.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003153988 (SHEPARD RUSTY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,16-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraphs [0015] , [0 16] , [0 20]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0021]; figure 2 * [I] 3-8,14,15,20; | [A]US6640314 (LELAURE ERIC [FR], et al) [A] 20 * abstract ** column 1, line 5 - line 27; figure 1 *; | [XAI]EP2728315 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12-16,18 * paragraphs [0039] - [0049] - [0 52]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056]; figures 2A-2C * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0090]; figure 6A * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100]; figure 8 * [A] 19,20 [I] 5,11,17; | [XI]US2018242100 (GANDHI AMOL [IN], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,16-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0051]; figure 3 * [I] 3-8,14,15,20 |