EP3972392 - SOFT X-RAY STATIC ELECTRICITY REMOVAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambridge Filter Corporation 14-2, Shiba 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | [2022/23] |
Former [2022/12] | For all designated states Kondoh Industries, Ltd. 14-2, Shiba 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | ||
For all designated states Cambridge Filter Japan Ltd. 14-2 Shiba 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISAKIBARU, Toshiro c/o Kondoh Industries, Ltd. 14-2, Shiba 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | 02 /
UENO, Kouta c/o Kondoh Industries, Ltd. 14-2, Shiba 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Makoto c/o Kondoh Industries, Ltd. 14-2, Shiba 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | 04 /
UESUGI, Nobuyuki c/o Cambridge Filter Japan, Ltd. 14-2, Shiba 3- chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | 05 /
IIDA, Naoji c/o Cambridge Filter Japan, Ltd. 14-2, Shiba 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | [2022/12] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/12] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20804912.2 | 14.05.2020 | [2022/12] | WO2020JP19358 | Priority number, date | JP20190092937 | 16.05.2019 Original published format: JP 2019092937 | [2022/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020230873 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3972392 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H05F3/06, H01T23/00 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H05F3/06 (EP,KR,US);
G21F3/00 (US);
H01T23/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/12] | H05F3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/12] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESEITIGUNG DER STATISCHEN ELEKTRIZITÄT VON WEICHEN RÖNTGENSTRAHLEN | [2022/12] | English: | SOFT X-RAY STATIC ELECTRICITY REMOVAL APPARATUS | [2022/12] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉLIMINATION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ STATIQUE À RAYONS X MOUS | [2022/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2021 | Translation filed | 13.10.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2021 | Examination requested [2022/12] | 14.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH076860 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [Y] 1-6 * figures 1-4b *; | [A]JP2001257096 (TECHNO RYOWA LTD, et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007048539 (KONDO KOGYO KK, et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008023727 (KONDOH IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6 * figures 1,2,5,6 * | International search | [YA]JPH076860 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [Y] 1-2, 5 * [0015]-[0022], 1-6 * [A] 3-4, 6; | [A]JP2001257096 (TECHNO RYOWA LTD, et al) [A] 1-6; | [A]JP2007048539 (KONDO KOGYO KK, et al)[A] 1-6; | [YA]WO2008023727 (KONDOH IND LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-2, 5 * [0013] - [0045], 1 - 6 * [A] 3-4, 6 | by applicant | WO2008023727 | JP2019092937 |