EP3965832 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING HEPATITIS B [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beam Therapeutics, Inc. 26 Landsdowne Street 2nd Floor Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMEKALOVA, Elena c/o Beam Therapeutics Inc. 26 Landsdowne St. 2nd. Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
PACKER, Michael c/o Beam Therapeutics Inc. 26 Landsdowne St. 2nd Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 03 /
GREGOIRE, Francine c/o Beam Therapeutics Inc. 26 Landsdowne St. 2nd Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 04 /
BARRERA, Luis c/o Beam Therapeutics Inc. 26 Landsdowne St. 2nd Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 05 /
CIARAMELLA, Giuseppe c/o Beam Therapeutics Inc. 26 Landsdowne St. 2nd Floor Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons LLP (Munich), et al Lehel Carré Gewürzmühlstraße 11 80538 Munich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Lahrtz, Fritz, et al Simmons & Simmons LLP Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20806106.9 | 08.05.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020US32226 | Priority number, date | US201962846422P | 10.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962846422 P | US201962927585P | 29.10.2019 Original published format: US 201962927585 P | [2022/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020231863 | Date: | 19.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3965832 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.11.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61K48/00, C12N15/113, C12N15/85, C12N15/90, C12N15/10, C12N9/22 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
C12N15/102 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/7088 (KR,US);
A61K48/00 (KR);
A61P31/20 (KR,US);
C07K14/005 (KR,US);
C12N15/113 (EP);
C12N15/1131 (KR,US);
C12N15/90 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12N9/78 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y305/04004 (EP,KR,US);
C12Y305/04005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HEPATITIS B | [2022/11] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING HEPATITIS B | [2022/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE L'HÉPATITE B | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 29.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2018129129 (UNIV RUTGERS [US]) [X] 1,2,8-18,24 * page 43, paragraph 2; claims 1-28 *[I] 1-3,6,8-26; | [I] - PENG CHENG ET AL, "CRISPR/Cas9-based tools for targeted genome editing and replication control of HBV", VIROLOGICA SINICA, SPRINGER, DE, vol. 30, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S12250-015-3660-X, ISSN 1674-0769, (20151022), pages 317 - 325, (20151022), XP035577004 [I] 1-3,6,8-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12250-015-3660-x | [I] - AYMAN EID ET AL, "CRISPR base editors: genome editing without double-stranded breaks", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, GB, (20180611), vol. 475, no. 11, doi:10.1042/BCJ20170793, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 1955 - 1964, XP055638645 [I] 1-3,6,8-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/BCJ20170793 | International search | [Y]US2018236103 (FRIEDLAND ARI E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 38-40, 78-82, 97 * claims 32, 33, 139, 140; para [0034], [0139], [0246] *; | [Y]WO2019023680 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al) [Y] 1-3, 38-40, 97 * claims 65-67; para [0325], [0677], [0678] *; | [Y]US2019093099 (LIU DAVID R [US], et al) [Y] 78-82 * claims 307-313; para [0078], [0106], [0236], [0393], [0419]; [0337], Table 27, SEQ ID NO: 703 *; | [Y] - KOSTIUSHEV et al., "A novel CRISPR/Cas9-based approach to transient activation of intracellular host restriction factors results in strong suppression of hepatitis B virus and degradation of cccDNA", Journal of Viral Hepatitis, (20180601), vol. 25, pages 16 - 17, XP055761872 [Y] 1-3, 38-40, 78-82, 97 * ; in entirety * | [XP] - YANG et al., "Permanent Inactivation of HBV Genomes by CRISPR/Cas9-Mediated Non-cleavage Base Editing", Mol Ther Nucleic Acids, (20200319), vol. 20, pages 480 - 490, XP055761877 [XP] 1-3, 38-40, 78-82, 97 * ; in entirety * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.omtn.2020.03.005 |